Address
c/o Fabio Olivi
Schanzenstrasse 20
4056 Basel
Reports for VoloSoft AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VoloSoft AG
- VoloSoft AG with its legal headquarters in Basel is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «IT services». VoloSoft AG is active.
- VoloSoft AG was founded on 27.05.2013.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 01.06.2016.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BS under the UID CHE-169.807.585.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.05.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.050.029-8
UID/VAT
CHE-169.807.585
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung und den Vertrieb von Hard- und Software aller Art, insbesondere Handelshard- und Handelssoftware für den Devisenhandel sowie Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und des Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Grundstücke, Urheberrechte, Patente und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- VoloSoft GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VoloSoft AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2863499, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
VoloSoft AG, in Liestal, CHE-169.807.585, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 23.02.2016, Publ. 2683035). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Basel im Handelsregister des Kantons Basel-Stadt eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Basel-Landschaft von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: 2863401, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
VoloSoft AG, bisher in Liestal, CHE-169.807.585, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 23.02.2016, Publ. 2683035).
Gründungsstatuten:
16.05.2013.
Statutenänderung:
20.05.2016.
Sitz neu:
Basel.
Domizil neu:
c/o Fabio Olivi, Schanzenstr. 20, 4056 Basel.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zandali, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schechen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zandali, Philipp, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schechen (DE), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Povse, Joze, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bad Aibling (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2683035, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
VoloSoft AG, in Liestal, CHE-169.807.585, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 23.12.2015, Publ. 2560663).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Povse, Joze, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bad Aibling (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Hittnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zandali, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schechen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Olivi, Fabio, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Basel, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Zandali, Philipp, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schechen (DE), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.