Address
c/o Gemeindeverwaltung Eischoll
Dorfstrasse 54
3943 Eischoll
Reports for Tourismus-Investitions AG Eischoll
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tourismus-Investitions AG Eischoll
- Tourismus-Investitions AG Eischoll has its legal headquarters in Eischoll, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 06.12.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VS is CHE-377.316.675.
Management (5)
newest board members
Dominik Amacker,
Diana Amacker,
Nino Walter Joseph Brunner,
Jean-Claude Daniel Clausen,
Lars Amacker
newest authorized signatories
Dominik Amacker,
Diana Amacker,
Nino Walter Joseph Brunner,
Jean-Claude Daniel Clausen,
Lars Amacker
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Eischoll
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.016.861-6
UID/VAT
CHE-377.316.675
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Bezweckt Investitionen, finanzielle Unterstützung und Vermietung in und von touristischen Anlagen. Kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Kann Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen und Urheberrechte, Patente und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Valesia AG | Visp | 03.04.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tourismus-Investitions AG Eischoll
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005350419, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Tourismus-Investitions AG Eischoll, in Eischoll, CHE-377.316.675, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 03.04.2017, S.0, Publ. 3442271).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Amacker, Felix, von Eischoll, in Eischoll, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Suter, Michaela, von Eischoll, in Aarau, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Amacker, Dominik, von Eischoll, in Eischoll, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Amacker, Diana, von Eischoll, in Eischoll, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3442271, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Tourismus-Investitions AG Eischoll, in Eischoll, CHE-377.316.675, c/o Gemeindeverwaltung Eischoll, Dorfstrasse 54, 3943 Eischoll, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
28.03.2017.
Zweck:
Bezweckt Investitionen, finanzielle Unterstützung und Vermietung in und von touristischen Anlagen. Kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Kann Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen und Urheberrechte, Patente und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 1'900'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 1'900'000.00.
Aktien:
1'900 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB für alle gesetzlich vorgeschriebenen und Amtsblatt des Kantons Wallis für alle übrigen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Brunner, Nino Walter Joseph, von Eischoll, in Eischoll, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Amacker, Felix, von Eischoll, in Eischoll, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Amacker, Lars, von Eischoll, in Eischoll, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Suter, Michaela, von Eischoll, in Aarau, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Clausen, Jean-Claude Daniel, von Ernen, in Rüdtligen (Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Treuhand Valesia AG (CHE-105.757.720), in Visp, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.