Branches (1)
Reports for Lunetta AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lunetta AG
- Lunetta AG has its legal headquarters in Reiden, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods».
- The company was founded on 11.04.1949.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 10.07.2023.
- The company Lunetta AG is registered under the UID CHE-102.527.566.
Management (3)
newest board members
Florian Gabele,
Thomas Manfred Gabele,
Siegfried Erich Gabele
newest authorized signatories
Florian Gabele,
Thomas Manfred Gabele,
Siegfried Erich Gabele
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.1949
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Reiden
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.916.274-8
UID/VAT
CHE-102.527.566
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Waren aller Art, insbesondere mit Brillen und anderen optischen Artikeln; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Im Fokus Treuhand AG | Sempach | 30.01.2013 | 14.09.2020 | |
Consida Treuhand GmbH | Berikon | 01.06.2007 | 29.01.2013 | |
Reviduna Revisions AG | Volketswil | <2004 | 31.05.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lunetta AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005790961, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lunetta AG, in Reiden, CHE-102.527.566, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 30.06.2022, Publ. 1005508494).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pelka, Roman Kurt Othmar, von Val de Bagnes, in Val de Bagnes, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gabele, Thomas Manfred, von Beringen, in Hallau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gabele, Florian, von Abtwil, in Schaffhausen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gabele, Siegfried Erich, von Beringen, in Hallau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005508494, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lunetta AG, in Reiden, CHE-102.527.566, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 24.06.2021, Publ. 1005227073).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ruepp, Johann Peter, genannt Hans-Peter, von Sarmenstorf, in Greppen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pelka, Roman Kurt Othmar, von Val de Bagnes, in Val de Bagnes, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Bagnes, in Bagnes, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005227073, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lunetta AG, in Reiden, CHE-102.527.566, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 04.01.2021, Publ. 1005063296).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der MEGA-MART GmbH, in Reiden (CHE-102.070.070), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 21.05.2021 und Bilanz per 31.12.2020. Aktiven von CHF 32'509.41 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 5'905.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Stammanteile der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.