Reports for Gubler Vermögens- und Verwaltungs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gubler Vermögens- und Verwaltungs AG
- Gubler Vermögens- und Verwaltungs AG has its legal headquarters in Wildegg and is active. It operates in the sector «Fiduciary services».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 04.04.1997.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 12.01.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-103.570.731.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.04.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Möriken-Wildegg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.018.320-5
UID/VAT
CHE-103.570.731
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Finanzierungs-, Versicherungs-, Management- und Marketingberatung, Geschäftsführung, Betriebsorganisation und -konzeption, Verkaufstraining, Projektierung, Akquisition und Vermittlung von Geschäften, Immobilien- und Vermögensverwaltung, Erwerb und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften, Handel mit Waren aller Art, inklusive Import und Export sowie Erbringung von diesbezüglichen Dienstleistungen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Effida Treuhand und Revisionen AG | Mellingen | 12.01.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Contra Treuhand & Verwaltungs AG | Mellingen | 31.12.2008 | 11.01.2021 | |
DWT Dieter Weisskopf Treuhand | Mellingen | <2004 | 30.12.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gubler Vermögens- und Verwaltungs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005071642, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Gubler Vermögens- und Verwaltungs AG, in Möriken-Wildegg, CHE-103.570.731, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 20.04.2020, Publ. 1004873716).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Contra Treuhand & Verwaltungs AG (CHE-108.753.434), in Mellingen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Effida Treuhand und Revisionen AG (CHE-101.631.600), in Mellingen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004873716, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Gubler Vermögens- und Verwaltungs AG, in Möriken-Wildegg, CHE-103.570.731, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2016, Publ. 3075629).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gubler, Beat, von Kienberg, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Villnachern].
Publication number: 3075629, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Gubler Vermögens- und Verwaltungs AG, in Möriken-Wildegg, CHE-103.570.731, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 01.12.2009, Publ. 5368586).
Statutenänderung:
15.09.2016.
Aktien neu:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief, Telefax oder elektronische Post rechtsgültig an die letzte der Gesellschaft gemeldete Adresse.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.