Jürg Ehrenbold
domiciled in Thundorf, from Romoos Active mandates: OekoTerra GmbH Connected persons: Silvia Aepli You can stay up to date through "Jürg Ehrenbold", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Ehrenbold"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jürg Ehrenbold", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jürg Ehrenbold"
|
Places where people with the name Jürg Ehrenbold live
Sectors in which people with the name Jürg Ehrenbold work
Agriculture (comestibles)
Agriculture (comestibles)
Private persons with the name Jürg Ehrenbold
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Jürg Ehrenbold
Publication number: HR02-1005706114, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
JE Unternehmens- & Finanzberatungen AG, in Luzern, CHE-293.151.739, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 20.01.2014, S.0, Publ. 1294169).
Firma neu:
JE Unternehmens- & Finanzberatungen AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft hat sich mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 10.03.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ehrenbold, Jürg Andreas, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005257563, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Ziegelei Hochdorf Immobilien AG, in Hochdorf, CHE-102.465.729, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 22.07.2008, S.10, Publ. 4583884).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ehrenbold, Jürg, von Luzern, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lufida Revisions AG, in Luzern (CH-100.3.007.813-6), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spörri, Kilian, von Hohenrain, in Hohenrain, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG (CHE-105.808.783), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005257562, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Ziegelei Hochdorf Holding AG, in Hochdorf, CHE-112.954.289, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 11.07.2012, S.0, Publ. 6762760).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ehrenbold, Jürg, von Luzern, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lufida Revisions AG (CH-100.3.007.813-6), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spörri, Kilian, von Hohenrain, in Hohenrain, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG (CHE-105.808.783), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle.