Markus Dittli
domiciled in Altdorf, from Gurtnellen Active mandates: Heizwerk Uri AG, Oeko-Energie AG Connected persons: Isidor Baumann, Fritz Beglinger, Marc Paul Vogt and more You can stay up to date through "Markus Dittli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Dittli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Markus Dittli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Dittli"
|
|
Markus Dittli
domiciled in Neuheim, from Gurtnellen Active mandates: Garage Markus Dittli Connected persons: Daniela Dittli You can stay up to date through "Markus Dittli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Dittli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Markus Dittli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Markus Dittli"
|
Places where people with the name Markus Dittli live
Sectors in which people with the name Markus Dittli work
Electrical power production and utilities
Architectural and engineering activities
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Electrical power production and utilities
Architectural and engineering activities
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Private persons with the name Markus Dittli
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Markus Dittli
Publication number: HR02-1004521023, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2018, Id. 4'324'635, publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 352 vom 26.06.2018 Netzgesellschaft Andermatt AG, in Andermatt, CHE-168.036.862, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 09.07.2018, Publ. 4345175).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dittli, Markus, von Gurtnellen, in Altdorf (UR), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser, Armin, von Altdorf (UR), in Seedorf (UR), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumann, Peter, von Andermatt, in Andermatt, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien zusammen mit Schmid Thomas, Zgraggen Simon oder Gisler Christian [nicht: in Wassen].
Publication number: 4316967, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Genossenschaft Vereinigte Milchbauern Mitte-Ost, in Gossau SG, CHE-103.443.676, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2018, Publ. 4005295).
Statutenänderung:
13.04.2018.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bachmann, Ernst, von Opfikon, in Flaach, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eugster, Peter, von Altstätten, in Lüchingen (Altstätten), Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dittli, Markus, von Gurtnellen, in Allenwinden (Baar), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mäder + Baumgartner Treuhand AG (CHE-103.815.364), in Neuhausen am Rheinfall, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Mäder + Baumgartner Treuhand AG, in Neuhausen am Rheinfall (CH-290.3.003.119-4)].
Publication number: 3432613, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Netzgesellschaft Andermatt AG, in Andermatt, CHE-168.036.862, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2016, Publ. 2723389).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dittli, Markus, von Gurtnellen, in Altdorf (UR), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser, Armin, von Altdorf (UR), in Seedorf (UR), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.