Andrea Cannarozzo
domiciled in Wikon, from Zofingen Active mandates: Wohlfahrtsfonds der Danfoss AG und der Werner Kuster AG, Danfoss AG Connected persons: André Meyer, Peter Hugo Biedert, Torben Christensen and more You can stay up to date through "Andrea Cannarozzo", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andrea Cannarozzo"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andrea Cannarozzo", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andrea Cannarozzo"
|
Places where people with the name Andrea Cannarozzo live
Sectors in which people with the name Andrea Cannarozzo work
Operation of an pension fund
Trading with machines
Operation of an pension fund
Trading with machines
Private persons with the name Andrea Cannarozzo
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Andrea Cannarozzo
Publication number: HR02-1005985705, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2024 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 1'069 vom 15.02.2024. Wohlfahrtsfonds der Danfoss AG und der Werner Kuster AG, in Frenkendorf, CHE-109.740.902, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2024, Publ. 1005965863).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cannarozzo, Andrea, von Zofingen, in Wikon, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005965863, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Wohlfahrtsfonds der Danfoss AG und der Werner Kuster AG, in Frenkendorf, CHE-109.740.902, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 23.07.2018, Publ. 4375301).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung (CHE-105.815.004), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cannarozzo, Andrea, von Zofingen, in Wikon, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Meyer, André, von Luzern, in Neuenkirch, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG (CHE-101.859.215), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4375287, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Danfoss AG, in Frenkendorf, CHE-105.825.190, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 12.02.2018, Publ. 4050105).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cannarozzo, Andrea, von Zofingen, in Wikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kollmann, Benno, von Entlebuch, in Hochwald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Entlebuch und Escholzmatt, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift].