Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Werner Lattmann
Wylandstrasse 31
8400 Winterthur
Reports for Zurlinda AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.1975
Deletion from the commercial register
20.03.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.929.488-3
UID/VAT
CHE-100.826.199
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf und Verkauf von Immobilien und Hypotheken sowie Erstellung von Neubauten und Beteiligung an Unternehmen der lmmobilienbranche. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Zürich | 12.11.2008 | 01.07.2014 | |
Balmer-Etienne AG Zürich | Zürich | 01.12.2004 | 11.11.2008 | |
Zoller Treuhand & Revisions AG | Zürich | <2004 | 30.11.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Zurlinda AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Zurlinda AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1004591589, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zurlinda AG in Liquidation, in Winterthur, CHE-100.826.199, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 28.12.2016, S.0, Publ. 3250493). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 3250493, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zurlinda AG, in Winterthur, CHE-100.826.199, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 03.06.2016, Publ. 2867619).
Firma neu:
Zurlinda AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 01.12.2016 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lattmann, Werner, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lattmann, Jürg, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lattmann, Peter, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lattmann, Rudolf, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 2867619, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zurlinda AG, in Winterthur, CHE-100.826.199, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2014, Publ. 1587055).
Domizil neu:
c/o Werner Lattmann, Wylandstrasse 31, 8400 Winterthur.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lattmann, Heinrich, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lattmann, Werner, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].