Reports for WINKELMANN ELEKTRO AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout WINKELMANN ELEKTRO AG
- WINKELMANN ELEKTRO AG is currently active and the industry «Other construction». The legal headquarters are in Kerzers.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 29.08.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-105.143.067.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Antonin Olivier Raoul Guez,
Guido Tranel,
Frédéric Palli,
Nico Patrick Knecht,
Roger Bühler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kerzers
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.530.784-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.143.067
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung, Projektierung, Realisierung und Instandhaltung von Stark-, Schwachstrom- und Kommunikationsanlagen, die Erbringung aller damit zusammenhängenden Dienstleistungen wie Service, Betrieb, Beratung sowie den Handel mit den dazugehörenden Komponenten. Im Übrigen kann die Gesellschaft alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche der Wahrung und Förderung der Konzerninteressen dienen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke im In- und Ausland erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Gesellschaftszweck im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Konzerngesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 29.08.2024 |
Former auditor (5)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 25.07.2022 | 28.08.2024 | |
Brügger Treuhand AG | Köniz | 21.11.2016 | 24.07.2022 | |
Brügger Treuhand | Köniz | 07.04.2015 | 20.11.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: WINKELMANN ELEKTRO AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006117173, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
WINKELMANN ELEKTRO AG, in Kerzers, CHE-105.143.067 (SHAB vom 27.03.2024, s. 0/1005995783).
Gelöschte Person:
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-441.858.784), Revisionsstelle.
Neu eingetragene Person:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-308.775.052), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005995783, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
WINKELMANN ELEKTRO AG, in Kerzers, CHE-105.143.067 (SHAB vom 25.07.2022, s. 0/1005528169).
Gelöschte Person:
Niedhart Nicolas, Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Neu eingetragene Personen:
Guez Antonin Olivier Raoul, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Dübendorf, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tranel Guido, von Kirchlindach, in Erlinsbach AG, Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005528169, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
WINKELMANN ELEKTRO AG, in Kerzers, CHE-105.143.067 (SHAB vom 19.05.2020, s. 0/1004892666).
Gelöschte Person:
Brügger Treuhand AG (CHE-328.181.418), Revisionsstelle.
Neu eingetragene Person:
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-441.858.784), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.