Reports for Windrose Consulting Group GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Windrose Consulting Group GmbH
- Windrose Consulting Group GmbH with its legal headquarters in Luzern is a Limited liability company from the sector «Services regarding management consulting». Windrose Consulting Group GmbH is active.
- The management of the company Windrose Consulting Group GmbH, which was founded on the 13.04.2021, consists of one person.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 22.02.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Windrose Consulting Group GmbH is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-474.981.262.
- On the same address as Windrose Consulting Group GmbH there are 11 other active companies registered. These include: Courzly AG, echt & gut GmbH, Go 2 Flow AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.04.2021
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.811.864-4
UID/VAT
CHE-474.981.262
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Beratungsdienstleistungen in der Gesundheitsbranche für globale Kommerzialisierungs-, Preis-, Zugangs- und Produkteinführungsstrategien für Medikamente und Impfstoffe für Klienten im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum und/oder andere Anlagegüter erwerben., belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Windrose Consulting Group GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005967958, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Windrose Consulting Group GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-474.981.262, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2021, Publ. 1005276348).
Domizil neu:
Grabenstrasse 8, 6004 Luzern.
Publication number: HR02-1005276348, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Windrose Consulting Group GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-474.981.262, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 16.04.2021, Publ. 1005151083).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spiering, Paul Kornelis Christiaan, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wettingen, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Storer, Matthew James, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Weybridge (GB)].
Publication number: HR01-1005151083, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Windrose Consulting Group GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-474.981.262, Hertensteinstrasse 51, 6004 Luzern, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
09.04.2021.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Beratungsdienstleistungen in der Gesundheitsbranche für globale Kommerzialisierungs-, Preis-, Zugangs- und Produkteinführungsstrategien für Medikamente und Impfstoffe für Klienten im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum und/oder andere Anlagegüter erwerben., belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax. Gemäss Erklärung des Gründers vom 09.04.2021 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Storer, Matthew James, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Weybridge (GB), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Spiering, Paul Kornelis Christiaan, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wettingen, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.