Reports for WEMAR Zwei-Rad AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout WEMAR Zwei-Rad AG
- WEMAR Zwei-Rad AG has its legal headquarters in Jona, is active and operates in the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles».
- WEMAR Zwei-Rad AG was founded on 05.10.1966.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 17.10.2023.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.798.144.
- Companies with an identical address: Diamonds Burger GmbH, MBG Associazione KLG, MBG Management GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.10.1966
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rapperswil-Jona
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.030.897-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.798.144
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verkauf und Kauf von Zwei-Rädern aller Art sowie Reparatur und Unterhalt derselben. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben und verkaufen sowie sich an andern Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Hüebli GmbH | Kaltbrunn | <2004 | 23.07.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wemar Weber Zwei-Rad AG
- Weber Wemar Zwei-Rad AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: WEMAR Zwei-Rad AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005862564, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
WEMAR Zwei-Rad AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-107.798.144, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2009, S.17, Publ. 5158390).
Domizil neu:
St. Gallerstrasse 120, 8645 Jona.
Publication number: 5158390, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Wemar Weber Zwei-Rad AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CH-320.3.030.897-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 11.04.2007, S. 14, Publ. 3879624).
Statutenänderung:
30.06.2009.
Firma neu:
WEMAR Zwei-Rad AG.
Aktien neu:
1'200 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00. [bisher: 115 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00, 50 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 (Stimmrechtsaktien)].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 30.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhand Hüebli GmbH, in Kaltbrunn, Revisionsstelle;
Weber-Rusch, Wolfram, von Schänis, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Weber-Rusch, Berta, von Schänis, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3879624, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Wemar Weber Zwei-Rad AG, bisher in Rapperswil SG, CH-320.3.030.897-4, Verkauf und Kauf von Zwei-Rädern aller Art usw. Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 14.10.2003, S. 9, Publ. 1213326).
Sitz neu:
Rapperswil-Jona. [behördliche Umbenennung].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weber-Rusch, Wolfram, von Schänis, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Rapperswil SG];
Weber, Raphael, von Schänis, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Rapperswil SG];
Weber-Rusch, Berta, von Schänis, in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Rapperswil SG].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.