Reports for WAEKA AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout WAEKA AG
- WAEKA AG is currently active and the industry «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof». The legal headquarters are in Mellingen.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 18.02.1976.
- On the 21.07.2017 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- WAEKA AG is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-107.891.275.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.02.1976
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Mellingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.002.100-3
UID/VAT
CHE-107.891.275
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation von und Handel mit Maschinen und Apparaten aller Art, insbesondere mit Wärme- und Kälteapparaten; die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Beteiligungen erwerben, halten oder veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Filiwag AG | Staufen | <2004 | 07.04.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: WAEKA AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3659641, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
WAEKA AG, in Mellingen, CHE-107.891.275, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 08.04.2010, Publ. 5577062).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niggemeier, Karl Heinz, von Zürich, in Rupperswil, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Herzig, Rico, von Lotzwil, in Mellingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5577062, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
WAEKA AG, in Mellingen, CH-400.3.002.100-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 13.07.1998, S. 4843).
Statutenänderung:
10.12.2009.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich oder im SHAB. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 10.12.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Filiwag AG, in Staufen, Revisionsstelle;
Dubravka, Ernst, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bergdietikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niggemeier, Karl Heinz, von Zürich, in Rupperswil, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Baden];
Keller, Bruno, von Eggenwil, in Künten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Waeka AG, in Mellingen, Fabrikation von Maschinen usw., Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.1995, S. 6781).
Statutenänderung:
22.05.1998.
Firma neu:
WAEKA AG.
Zweck neu:
Fabrikation von und Handel mit Maschinen und Apparaten aller Art, insbesondere mit Wärme- und Kälteapparaten;
die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Beteiligungen erwerben, halten oder veräussern.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen brieflich, oder, sofern das Gesetz nicht zwingend etwas anderes vorschreibt, durch Publikation im SHAB.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Herzig, Rico, von Lotzwil, in Mellingen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Niggemeier, Karl Heinz, von Zürich, in Baden, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident];
Dubravka, Ernst, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bergdietikon, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.