Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for VSG Verlags Service Gesellschaft AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.01.2006
Deletion from the commercial register
20.07.2021
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.013.683-0
UID/VAT
CHE-112.721.259
Sector
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erbringen von Verlagsdienstleistungen aller Art, insbesondere die Vermittlung von Anzeigen, das Erbringen von redaktionellen Dienstleistungen sowie Druckdienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich daneben an anderen Unternehmen irgendwelcher Art im In- und Ausland beteiligen, solche gründen, übernehmen und mit ihnen fusionieren. Sie kann Liegenschaften und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie durch Beschluss des Verwaltungsrates Zweigniederlassungen und Agenturen im In- oder Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Basel | 17.09.2014 | 14.11.2016 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Basel | 23.04.2012 | 16.09.2014 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | 19.01.2006 | 22.04.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SSE Société des Services d'Edition SA en liquidation
- CES Company of Editorial Services Ltd in liquidation
- SSE Société des Services d'Edition SA
- VSG Verlags Service Gesellschaft AG
- CES Company of Editorial Services Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VSG Verlags Service Gesellschaft AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005253465, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
VSG Verlags Service Gesellschaft AG in Liquidation, in Basel, CHE-112.721.259, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2018, Publ. 4044623). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht [Publikation 1.
Schuldenruf:
SHAB vom 13.02.2018;
Publikation 2.
Schuldenruf:
SHAB vom 14.02.2018;
Publikation 3.
Schuldenruf:
SHAB vom 15.02.2018].
Publication number: 4044623, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
VSG Verlags Service Gesellschaft AG, in Basel, CHE-112.721.259, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 31.07.2017, Publ. 3674031).
Firma neu:
VSG Verlags Service Gesellschaft AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(SSE Société des Services d'Edition SA en liquidation) (CES Company of Editorial Services Ltd in liquidation).
Vinkulierung neu:
Die statutarische Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist infolge Auflösung von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 29.01.2018 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ludwig, Dr. Hubertus, von Gelterkinden, in Sissach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3674031, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
VSG Verlags Service Gesellschaft AG, in Basel, CHE-112.721.259, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 15.06.2017, Publ. 3582097).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schnyder, Dr. Roman, von Gampel und Steg, in Reinach (BL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ludwig, Dr. Hubertus, von Gelterkinden, in Sissach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].