Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Bank Ehinger & Cie AG
Freie Strasse 107
4051 Basel
Reports for Vorsorgestiftung der Bank Ehinger & Cie AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.01.2002
Deletion from the commercial register
25.02.2005
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.7.002.820-2
UID/VAT
CHE-109.706.851
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausrichtung von Vorsorgeleistungen an die Arbeitnehmer der Stifterfirma sowie deren Angehörige und Hinterbliene in Notlagen wie bei Krankheiten, Unfall, Invalidität und Arbeitslosigkeit. Die Stiftung bezweckt ausserdem die Finanzierung und Leistung von Beiträgen der Stifterfirma an steuerbefreite Personalvorsorgeeinrichtungen, denen sich die Stifterfirma angeschlossen oder die sie selbst errichtet hat.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | <2004 | 24.02.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Vorsorgestiftung der Bank Ehinger & Cie AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Vorsorgestiftung der Bank Ehinger & Cie AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2718414, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Vorsorgestiftung der Bank Ehinger & Cie AG in Liquidation, in Basel, CH-270.7.002.820-2, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 04.09.2003, S. 6, Publ. 1157056).
Löschungsgrund:
Stiftung infolge Erschöpfung der Mittel mit Verfügung vom 21.12.2004 des Justizdepartements Basel-Stadt Aufsichtsbehörde BVG gemäss Art. 88 Abs. 1 ZGB von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Liquidation beendigt. Stiftung mit Zustimmung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 07.02.2005 im Handelsregister gelöscht.
Publication number: 1157056, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Vorsorgestiftung der Bank Ehinger & Cie AG, in Basel, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 22.01.2003, S. 6, Publ. 824492).
Name neu:
Vorsorgestiftung der Bank Ehinger & Cie AG in Liquidation. Auflösung der Stiftung gemäss Verfügung vom 11.07.2003 des Justizdepartements Basel-Stadt Aufsichtsbehörde BVG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weiss, Markus, von Basel, in Binningen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidator [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Tondolo, Raffaello, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidator [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Siegrist, Katharina, von Oberwil BL und Lostorf, in Oberwil BL, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Liquidatorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien als Liquidatorin [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 824492, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Vorsorgestiftung der Bank Ehinger & Cie AG, in Basel, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 26.03.2002, S. 5, Publ. 401078).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reitzer, Raymond, von Basel und Rorschach, in Oberwil BL, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Siegrist, Katharina, von Oberwil BL und Lostorf, in Oberwil BL, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.