Reports for Von Grünigen Combustibles SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Von Grünigen Combustibles SA
- Von Grünigen Combustibles SA with its legal headquarters in Chesières is active. Von Grünigen Combustibles SA operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- The management has one active person registered.
- On the 06.07.2010 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-103.699.129.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.02.1986
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ollon
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.177.662-9
UID/VAT
CHE-103.699.129
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce et transport de combustibles.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ORFA Audit SA | Lausanne | 18.04.2007 | 05.07.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Von Grünigen & Cie.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Von Grünigen Combustibles SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5713584, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Von Grünigen Combustibles SA, à Ollon, CH-550-0177662-9 (FOSC du 26.11.2008, p. 22/4750978). Statuts modifiés le 25 juin 2010. Les faits déjà publiés ne sont pas modifiés.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 25 juin 2010, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. ORFA Audit SA (CH-550-0076052-6) n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: 4750978, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Von Grünigen Combustibles SA, à Ollon, CH-550-0177662-9, commerce et transport de combustibles (FOSC du 18.04.2007, p. 15/3889514). L'organe de révision ORFA - Organe de Révision des Fiduciaires Associées S.A. a modifié sa raison de commerce en ORFA Audit SA (CH-550-0076052-6)
Publication number: 3889514, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
von Grünigen & Cie, à Ollon, CH-550-0177662-9, commerce de combustibles (FOSC du 25.02.1986, p. 722).
Transformation:
la société en nom collectif von Grünigen & Cie est transformée en société anonyme conformément au projet de transformation du 30 mars 2007 et bilan au 31 décembre 2006, présentant des actifs de CHF 1'677'062.86 et des passifs envers les tiers de CHF 1'357'062.80, soit un actif net de CHF 320'000, contre attribution aux associés de 320 actions de CHF 1'000.
Nouvelle forme de droit:
société anonyme.
Statuts:
30 mars 2007.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Von Grünigen Combustibles SA.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chesières, chalet Gloria.
Nouveau but:
commerce et transport de combustibles.
Capital-actions entièrement libéré:
CHF 320'000, divisé en 320 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce. La signature de von Grünigen Gisèle est radiée.
Administration:
Moret Jean-Michel, désormais à Chesières, avec signature individuelle.
Réviseur:
ORFA - Organe de Révision des Fiduciaires Associées SA, à Aigle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.