Reports for VETROPA SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VETROPA SA
- VETROPA SA has its legal headquarters in Vevey, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The company was founded on 05.12.1947.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 25.01.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company VETROPA SA is registered under the UID CHE-102.856.679.
- Companies with the same address as VETROPA SA: Blue Bottle Holdings Sàrl, DPA (Holding) SA, Fonds de Pensions Complémentaire Nestlé (Fondation Louis Dapples).
Management (3)
newest board members
Silvan Peter Jampen,
Urs Eduard Zurbrügg,
Stefan Ulrich Helfenstein
newest authorized signatories
Silvan Peter Jampen,
Urs Eduard Zurbrügg,
Stefan Ulrich Helfenstein
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.12.1947
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Vevey
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.130.708-0
UID/VAT
CHE-102.856.679
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'ahat, la vente et la gestion de participations à toutes entreprises industrielles, commerciales ou financières, suisse ou étrangères.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young SA | Lausanne | 31.08.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG SA | Lausanne | 19.08.2009 | 30.08.2020 | |
KPMG Klynveld Peat Marwick Goerdeler SA in Liquidation | Zürich | <2004 | 18.08.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- VETROPA CO Ltd.
- VETROPA AG
- Vetropa AG
- Vetropa Co Ltd
- Vetropa SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VETROPA SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005944418, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
VETROPA SA, à Vevey, CHE-102.856.679 (FOSC du 04.05.2021, p. 0/1005168944). Helfenstein Stefan Ulrich est maintenant à Hergiswil (NW).
Publication number: HR02-1005168944, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Vetropa S.A., précédemment à Fribourg, CHE-102.856.679 (FOSC du 31.08.2020, p. 0/1004967916). Siège transféré à Vevey.
Nouvelle adresse:
Avenue Nestlé 55, 1800 Vevey.
Nouvelle graphie de la raison de commerce:
VETROPA SA (VETROPA AG) (VETROPA CO Ltd.). Statuts modifiés le 21.04.2021.
Nouvelles communications aux actionnaires:
par lettre. Checa Cortés José Maria n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Jampen Silvan, de Müntschemier, à Kerzers, avec signature individuelle, et Zurbrügg Urs, de Reichenbach im Kandertal, à Neuheim, avec signature individuelle, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Publication number: HR02-1005168287, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Vetropa S.A. , à Fribourg, CHE-102.856.679 (FOSC du 31.08.2020, p. 0/1004967916). Cette entité juridique est radiée du registre du commerce du canton de Fribourg par suite du transfert du siège à Vevey, sous la nouvelle raison sociale VETROPA SA.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.