Address
Via Alberto Giacometti 1
6900 Lugano
Reports for Verzasca SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Verzasca SA
- Verzasca SA has its legal headquarters in Lugano and is active. It operates in the sector «Electrical power production and utilities».
- The management of the company Verzasca SA, which was founded on the 08.06.1960, consists of 11 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 28.07.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-105.941.784.
- Companies with an identical address: 1945 HOLDING SA, 2Comply Sagl, 3C Global Consulting Sagl.
Management (11)
newest board members
Marco Joseph Netzer,
Usman Mirza Baig,
Gianni Alessandro Gnesa,
Michele Giuseppe Foletti,
Edi Achille Giovanni Losa
newest authorized signatories
Marco Joseph Netzer,
Usman Mirza Baig,
Giorgio Dagani,
Gianni Alessandro Gnesa,
Michele Giuseppe Foletti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.06.1960
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lugano
Commercial Registry Office
TI
Commercial register number
CH-514.3.001.080-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.941.784
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language)
Lo sfruttamento delle forze idriche della Verzasca, dei suoi affluenti da quota 470.00 m s/m fino a quota 193.20 m s/m (livello medio Lago Maggiore) in base alla concessione relativa del 3 dicembre 1959.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
STUDIO GIUSEPPE FERRARI SA - Revisioni e consulenze aziendali | Lugano | 03.07.2015 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Urs R. Ris | Ascona | 12.10.2009 | 07.07.2015 | |
BDO AG | Lamone | 05.02.2015 | 02.07.2015 | |
Ufficio fiduciario e commerciale A. Ferrata | Lugano | <2004 | 11.10.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Verzasca SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005806649, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Verzasca SA, in Lugano, CHE-105.941.784, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 66 del 04.04.2023, Pubbl. 1005717030).
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Netzer, Marco, da Surses, in Breganzona (Lugano), membro, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente, il vice-presidente o il direttore.
Publication number: HR02-1005717030, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Verzasca SA, in Lugano, CHE-105.941.784, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 200 del 14.10.2021, Pubbl. 1005312640).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Maiocchi, Luca, da Biasca, in Breganzona (Lugano), membro, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente, il vice-presidente o il direttore.
Publication number: HR02-1005312640, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Verzasca SA, in Lugano, CHE-105.941.784, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 172 del 06.09.2021, Pubbl. 1005285153).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Zanetti, Filippo, da Poschiavo, in Sonvico (Lugano), membro, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente, il vice-presidente o il direttore .
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Mirza Baig, Usman, da Massagno, in Cadenazzo, membro, con firma collettiva a due con il presidente, il vice-presidente o il direttore.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.