Address
c/o Miriam Hess
Staldenweg 1
6313 Menzingen
Reports for Verein MUNTERwegs
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Verein MUNTERwegs
- Verein MUNTERwegs with its legal headquarters in Menzingen is an Association from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Verein MUNTERwegs is active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The organization was founded on 23.06.2009.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 24.07.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Verein MUNTERwegs is registered in the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-114.929.397.
- Companies with an identical address: 4 energy - Hess, 4motion GmbH, ARIADNE - Hess.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.06.2009
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Menzingen
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.6.000.220-0
UID/VAT
CHE-114.929.397
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der Chancengleichheit von unterprivilegierten Kindern, Jugendlichen und Eltern im Bereich der Bildung und Steigerung ihrer Lebensqualität; Förderung des Erwerbs der deutschen und schweizerdeutschen Sprache und somit der Integration von ausländischen Kindern, Jugendlichen und Erwachsenen; Förderung der Kontakte zwischen Ausländer/innen und Schweizer/innen und Erleichterung des Zusammenlebens; Information, Beratung und Unterrichtung von Kindern, Jugendlichen und Eltern in den schulischen Bereichen, Unterstützung bei der Suche einer Lehrstelle / Ausbildung sowie Auseinandersetzung mit dem Thema Jugendgewalt und Gesundheitsprävention; Anbieten von Kursen in den Bereichen Bildung und Lebensführung; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Verein MUNTERwegs
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005802304, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Verein MUNTERwegs, in Menzingen, CHE-114.929.397, Verein (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 25.08.2020, Publ. 1004964238).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Linder, Karin, von Luzern, in Emmen, Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Draeger, Irma, von Rüschegg, in Hünenberg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Hilzingen (DE), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Müller, Janine, von Muttenz, in Basel, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004964238, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Verein MUNTERwegs, in Menzingen, CHE-114.929.397, Verein (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 27.12.2012, S.0, Publ. 6995154).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gubser, Beatrice, von Zürich, in Unterägeri, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6995154, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Verein MUNTERwegs, in Menzingen, CH-170.6.000.220-0, Verein (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 14.06.2010, S. 22, Publ. 5673824).
Statutenänderung:
25.05.2012, 10.09.2012, 14.12.2012.
Organisation neu:
[Die bisher im Handelsregister eingetragene Bemerkung über die Organisation wird gelöscht.]. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gubser, Beatrice, von Zürich, in Unterägeri, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.