Address
c/o M. Piccirillo
General-Wille-Strasse 60
8706 Feldmeilen
Reports for VALUGEN GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VALUGEN GmbH
- VALUGEN GmbH with its legal headquarters in Feldmeilen is active. VALUGEN GmbH operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting».
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 18.03.2002.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 30.09.2021.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-109.517.729.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.03.2002
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Meilen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.024.806-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.517.729
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im Bereich des Produktivitätsmanagements in Gesundheitswesen; insbesondere Beratung, Coaching und Implementierung von MIS Systemen; kann alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VALUGEN GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005301795, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
VALUGEN GmbH, in Meilen, CHE-109.517.729, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 04.11.2009, S.32, Publ. 5326374).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wilfart, Martin, von Olten, in Däniken, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 4'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Piccirillo, Michael, von Meilen, in Meilen, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 16'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Straub Piccirillo, Doris, von Meilen, in Meilen, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 4'000.00.
Publication number: 5326374, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
VALUGEN GmbH, in Meilen, CH-020.4.024.806-9, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 22.03.2002, S. 18, Publ. 395868). Gemäss Erklärung vom 26.06.2009 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
VALUGEN GmbH, in Meilen, c/o Michael Piccirillo, General Wille-Strasse 60, 8706 Feldmeilen, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
6.03.2002.
Zweck:
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im Bereich des Produktivitätsmanagements in Gesundheitswesen;
insbesondere Beratung, Coaching und Implementierung von MIS Systemen;
kann alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Eingetragene Personen:
Piccirillo, Michael, von Meilen, in Meilen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 16'000.--;
Wilfart, Martin, von Olten, in Däniken, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 4'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.