Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Valmeca S.A. en liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.09.1971
Deletion from the commercial register
08.12.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Courgenay
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-677.3.000.348-9
UID/VAT
CHE-100.676.497
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes opérations industrielles et commerciales se rapportant à la mécanique, l'électricité et l'électronique, ainsi que la création, l'acquisition, la location, la prise à bail, l'installation, l'exploitation de tous établissements, usines, ateliers se rapportant à l'une ou l'autre des activités spécifiées. La prise, l'acquisition, l'exploitation ou la cession de tous procédés, brevets concernant ces activités. La participation directe ou indirecte de la société dans toutes opérations commerciales ou industrielles pouvant se rattacher à l'objet social, notamment par voie de création de sociétés nouvelles, d'apports de commandite, de souscription ou d'achat de titres ou droits sociaux, de fusion, d'alliance ou d'association en participation ou autrement, et généralement, toutes opérations financières commerciales, industrielles, mobilières et immobilières pouvant se rattacher directement ou indirectement à l'un des objets spécifiés ou à tout autre objet similaire ou connexe.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Simon Kohler S.A. | Courgenay | 10.07.1995 | 07.12.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Valmeca S.A.
- Valmeca SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Valmeca S.A. en liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005042644, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Valmeca S.A. en liquidation, à Courgenay, CHE-100.676.497, société anonyme (No. FOSC 172 du 05.09.2012, p.0, Publ. 6836710). Raison sociale radiée, la liquidation étant terminée.
Publication number: 6836710, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Valmeca S.A., à Courgenay, CH-677.3.000.348-9, société anonyme (No. FOSC 232 du 28.11.1996, p. 7350).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Valmeca S.A. en liquidation.
Nouvelle autre adresse:
c/o Jean-Jacques Cattin, Rue du Cerisier 4, 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds. Suivant procès-verbal authentique de son assemblée générale du 22.06.2012, la société a décidé sa dissolution.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Kohler, Jean-François, de Elay et Courgenay, à Courgenay, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Neukomm, Willy, de Eggiwil, à Courgenay, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cattin, Jean-Jacques Marie Antoine, de Les Bois, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle.
Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Valmeca S.A., à Courgenay, opérations industrielles et commerciales (FOSC du 10.7.1995, no131, p.3874). Arthur Petignat, secrétaire, a démissionné;
sa signature est radiée. Jean-François Kohler, de Elay et Courgenay, à Courgenay, est nommé président. Willy Neukomm, d'Eggiwil, à Courgenay, est nommé secrétaire. La société sera désormais engagée par la signature collective à deux du président et du secrétaire.
Nouvelle adresse:
rue Pierre-Péquignat 23.