Reports for TV Bautech AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TV Bautech AG
- TV Bautech AG has its legal headquarters in Selzach and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company TV Bautech AG, which was founded on the 23.11.2018, consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 02.08.2019.
- The reported UID is CHE-134.091.656.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.11.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Selzach
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.017.285-7
UID/VAT
CHE-134.091.656
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung, Planung, Projektierung von im Baunebengewerbe anfallenden Arbeiten, insbesondere Umbauten, Renovationen und Sanierungen, ferner Handel mit Waren aller Art. Kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, Grundeigentum und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, um die Entwicklung der Gesellschaft und die Erreichung ihres Zwecks zu fördern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TV Bautech AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004688711, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
TV Bautech AG, in Feldbrunnen-St. Niklaus, CHE-134.091.656, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2018, Publ. 1004507748).
Statutenänderung:
18.07.2019.
Sitz neu:
Selzach.
Domizil neu:
Bettlacherstrasse 7, 2545 Selzach.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vogt, David, von Grenchen, in Riedholz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tschümperlin, Pius, von Schwyz, in Biberist, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR01-1004507748, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
TV Bautech AG, in Feldbrunnen-St. Niklaus, CHE-134.091.656, Steinenbergstrasse 8, 4532 Feldbrunnen, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
21.11.2018.
Zweck:
Beratung, Planung, Projektierung von im Baunebengewerbe anfallenden Arbeiten, insbesondere Umbauten, Renovationen und Sanierungen, ferner Handel mit Waren aller Art. Kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, Grundeigentum und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, um die Entwicklung der Gesellschaft und die Erreichung ihres Zwecks zu fördern.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Mit Erklärung vom 21.11.2018 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Tschümperlin, Pius, von Schwyz, in Biberist, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Vogt, David, von Grenchen, in Riedholz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.