Reports for Tucan AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tucan AG
- Tucan AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Hombrechtikon. Tucan AG belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 17.10.1989.
- On the 26.10.2017 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Tucan AG is the following: CHE-101.649.043.
Management (4)
newest board members
Andreas Binus,
Dr. Andrea Angehrn,
Giovanna Kissner,
Dr. Jürg Skalsky
newest authorized signatories
Andreas Binus,
Dr. Andrea Angehrn,
Giovanna Kissner,
Dr. Jürg Skalsky
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.10.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hombrechtikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.927.124-5
UID/VAT
CHE-101.649.043
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften, um diese der einfachen Gesellschaft Ärztepraxis Eichwis, Hombrechtikon, als Praxisräumlichkeiten zur Verfügung zu stellen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner, Zürich AG | Zürich | <2004 | 19.10.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tucan AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3832635, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tucan AG, in Hombrechtikon, CHE-101.649.043, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 18.11.2014, Publ. 1828315).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Künzler, Elisabeth, von Walzenhausen, in Bubikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Binus, Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Tuggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1828315, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tucan AG, in Hombrechtikon, CHE-101.649.043, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 203 vom 20.10.2008, S. 22, Publ. 4697652).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Angehrn, Dr. Andrea, von Muolen und Mels, in Rapperswil-Jona, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Jona, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Skalsky, Dr. Jürg, von Zürich, in Stäfa, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4697652, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Tucan AG, in Hombrechtikon, CH-020.3.927.124-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2007, S. 25, Publ. 3764820).
Statutenänderung:
08.08.2008. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 26.08.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kuhn Treuhand AG, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Skalsky, Dr. Jürg, von Zürich, in Stäfa, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Wangen-Brüttisellen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.