Reports for Thermobois S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Thermobois S.A.
- Thermobois S.A. has its legal headquarters in Courchavon, is active and operates in the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods».
- The management consists of 9 persons. The company was founded on 13.03.1989.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 04.03.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of JU is CHE-106.435.822.
Management (9)
newest board members
Alain Thierry André Rossé,
Mélanie Erb,
Géraldine Marie-Claire Beuchat-Willemin,
Gérard Georges Marcel Meyer,
Dominique Jean Wahl
newest authorized signatories
Géraldine Marie-Claire Beuchat-Willemin,
Gérard Georges Marcel Meyer,
Mathieu Jean-Michel René Gigon,
Manuel Julien Godinat
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.03.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Courchavon
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-677.3.000.337-9
UID/VAT
CHE-106.435.822
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Produire et fournir du combustible ou de l'énergie à partir du bois; encourager et promouvoir la production et l'utilisation du bois-énergie; entretenir, exploiter et participer au développement d'installations qui se réfèrent aux points ci-dessus, assurer la vente de matériel nécessaire à ces installations de même que les services et tout commerce en lien avec ces activités. La société peut assumer des participations à toutes entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir ou créer des entreprises semblables ou similaires, fonder des succursales en Suisse ou à l'étranger et se charger de toutes les opérations ou fonctions de nature à développer le but de la société ou ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son objet. Elle peut acquérir, détenir ou aliéner des immeubles.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDAG Jura SA | Delémont | 29.11.2019 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audit Transjurane SA | Delémont | 02.07.2019 | 28.11.2019 | |
CRF Conseil, Révision et Fiscalité SA | Delémont | 06.03.2009 | 01.07.2019 | |
KPMG SA | Delémont | <2004 | 05.03.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Thermobois SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Thermobois S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005976965, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Thermobois S.A., à Courchavon, CHE-106.435.822, société anonyme (No. FOSC 251 du 28.12.2023, Publ. 1005922586).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Ackermann, Marcel Bernard Joseph, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Bourrignon, membre, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Rossé, Alain Thierry André, de Boécourt, à Montavon (Boécourt), membre du conseil d'administration, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005922586, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Thermobois S.A., à Courchavon, CHE-106.435.822, société anonyme (No. FOSC 232 du 29.11.2019, Publ. 1004771825).
Modification des statuts:
29.11.2023.
Nouveau but:
Produire et fournir du combustible ou de l'énergie à partir du bois;
encourager et promouvoir la production et l'utilisation du bois-énergie;
entretenir, exploiter et participer au développement d'installations qui se réfèrent aux points ci-dessus, assurer la vente de matériel nécessaire à ces installations de même que les services et tout commerce en lien avec ces activités. La société peut assumer des participations à toutes entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir ou créer des entreprises semblables ou similaires, fonder des succursales en Suisse ou à l'étranger et se charger de toutes les opérations ou fonctions de nature à développer le but de la société ou ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son objet. Elle peut acquérir, détenir ou aliéner des immeubles.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Oriet, Mélanie, de Pleigne, à Bassecourt (Haute-Sorne), membre du conseil d'administration, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Erb, Mélanie, de Saxon, à Cornol, membre du conseil d'administration, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004771825, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Thermobois S.A., à Courchavon, CHE-106.435.822, société anonyme (No. FOSC 128 du 05.07.2019, Publ. 1004669600).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
FIDAG Jura SA (CHE-105.190.411), à Delémont, organe de révision [précédemment: Audit Transjurane SA (CHE-102.252.151)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.