Reports for tesa tape Schweiz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout tesa tape Schweiz AG
- tesa tape Schweiz AG with its legal headquarters in Urdorf is active. tesa tape Schweiz AG operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- tesa tape Schweiz AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 17.08.2021.
- The company tesa tape Schweiz AG is registered under the UID CHE-172.686.595.
- On the same address as tesa tape Schweiz AG there are 19 other active companies registered. These include: Allane Mobility Consulting AG, Allane Schweiz AG, Aregger Elektro Urdorf AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.03.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Urdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.033.944-0
UID/VAT
CHE-172.686.595
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Selbsklebeprodukten, Klebe- und Verpackungsgeräten sowie weiteren Produkten von Konzern- und Drittliferanten; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 25.03.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- tesa tape Schweiz Ltd
- tesa tape Schweiz SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: tesa tape Schweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005272036, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
tesa tape Schweiz AG, in Urdorf, CHE-172.686.595, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 19.03.2021, Publ. 1005127977).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gebbeken, Dr. Bernhard, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frischmuth, Stephan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005127977, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
tesa tape Schweiz AG, in Urdorf, CHE-172.686.595, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 160 vom 19.08.2020, Publ. 1004960451).
Statutenänderung:
05.03.2021.
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004960451, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
tesa tape Schweiz AG, in Urdorf, CHE-172.686.595, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 09.07.2019, Publ. 1004670930).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meyer, Christoph, von Basel, in Binningen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grobe, Claus Roman, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wien (AT), Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gebbeken, Dr. Bernhard, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frei, Felix, von Pfäffikon, in Wädenswil, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bourquin, André, von Sonvilier, in Ennetbürgen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.