Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for TEMPUS Privatbank AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.11.1997
Deletion from the commercial register
31.10.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.020.217-9
UID/VAT
CHE-108.692.181
Sector
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Bank; Konzentration auf Vermögensberatung und -verwaltung und die damit in Zusammenhang stehenden Geschäfte und Dienstleistungen sowie auf den Effektenhandel; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie im Rahmen ihres Gesellschaftszweckes Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- TEMPUS Private Bank Ltd
- TEMPUS Banque Privée SA
- TEMPUS Vermögensverwaltungs AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TEMPUS Privatbank AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4178480, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TEMPUS Privatbank AG, in Zürich, CH-020.3.020.217-9, Betrieb einer Bank, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 08.04.2004, S. 22, Publ. 2206402). Die Vorschriften von Art. 748 OR sind eingehalten. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 2206402, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TEMPUS Privatbank AG, in Zürich, Betrieb einer Bank, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 23.03.2004, S. 19, Publ. 2180818). Auflösung der Gesellschaft durch Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 29.03.2004 infolge Fusion mit der M.M. Warburg Bank (Schweiz) AG, in Zürich. Aktiven und Passiven der Gesellschaft gehen gemäss Fusionsbilanz per 31.12.2003 durch Universalsukzession auf die M.M. Warburg Bank (Schweiz) AG über.
Publication number: 2180818, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
TEMPUS Privatbank AG, in Zürich, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 15.01.2004, S. 21, Publ. 2072374).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zimmermann, Heinz, von Schwändi und Glarus, in St. Gallen, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pfeifer, Dr. Michael, von Basel und Metzerlen, in Basel, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Nüesch, Niklaus Peter, von St. Gallen und Balgach, in St. Gallen, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bindschedler, Dr. Georges, von Zürich und Bern, in Muri bei Bern, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Olearius, Dr. Christian Gottfried, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Altorfer, Dr. Peter, von Zürich und Uster, in Küsnacht ZH, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brändle, Adolf, von Alt St. Johann, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hitchman, Roy Clifford, von Herrliberg, in Zollikon, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Warburg, Max Marcus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kämmler, Wolfgang, von Neerach und Niederglatt, in Neerach, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vorwerk, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.