Reports for T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG
- T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Kreuzlingen. T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG belongs to the industry «IT services» and is currently active.
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 13.08.2024.
- The company T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG is registered under the UID CHE-115.992.613.
- AN Schweiz AG, Antaris Solar AG, BEMIX Immobilien AG are registered at the same address.
Management (5)
newest board members
Andreas Klaus Heselschwerdt,
Michel Henderson Grandchamp-Robustelli,
Sonja Erika Stettler
newest authorized signatories
Andreas Klaus Heselschwerdt,
Michel Henderson Grandchamp-Robustelli,
Daniel Alexander Röder,
Sonja Erika Stettler,
Madlen Belinda Richter
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.09.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kreuzlingen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.024.394-4
UID/VAT
CHE-115.992.613
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Leistungen aller Art im Bereich der Informations- und Kommunikationstechnologie, insbesondere von Beratungsdienstleistungen, Entwicklung von Software, Integration von Systemen der Informations- und Kommunikationstechnologie, Dienstleistungen im Personalbereich sowie Vertrieb von Informatiklösungen, welche Informationssysteme, Software und Kommunikationssysteme einschliessen können. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Massnahmen ergreifen und Geschäfte abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Gesellschaftszweck zu fördern. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen und Kooperationen mit anderen Gesellschaften eingehen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 17.05.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 08.11.2011 | 16.05.2022 | |
BDO AG | Zürich | 20.09.2010 | 07.11.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- T-Systems Data Migration Consulting Ltd
- T-Systems Data Migration Consulting SA
- Data Migration Consulting AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006105710, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-115.992.613, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 241 vom 12.12.2023, Publ. 1005908063).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Drouven, Uwe, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bonn (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grandchamp-Robustelli, Michel Henderson, von Puidoux, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Heselschwerdt, Andreas Klaus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stettler, Sonja, von Zuchwil, in Oberdorf SO, Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005908063, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-115.992.613, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 27.12.2022, Publ. 1005639157).
Statutenänderung:
14.09.2023. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]
Publication number: HR02-1005639157, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
T-Systems Data Migration Consulting AG, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-115.992.613, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 17.05.2022, Publ. 1005475702).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Balgheim, Dirk, von Zürich, in Küsnacht ZH, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Röder, Daniel Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rümmingen (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.