Reports for Swiss Rides AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swiss Rides AG
- Swiss Rides AG from Flums operates in the sector «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof» and is active.
- Swiss Rides AG was founded on 08.10.2008.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 06.05.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Swiss Rides AG is the following: CHE-114.534.260.
- Companies with the same address as Swiss Rides AG: Bartholet Maschinenbau AG, Carrosserie Carrera GmbH, Grossbearbeitungs AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.10.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Flums
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.064.118-0
UID/VAT
CHE-114.534.260
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung, Vermittlung und Vertrieb von Freizeitanlagen und Komponenten von Freizeitanlagen jeglicher Art, Planung, Ausstattung und Erstellung von Konzepten für die Freizeitindustrie sowie deren Ausführung; auch als Zulieferer oder Subunternehmer. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, solche erwerben oder errichten, gewerbliche Schutzrechte, Know-How, Immaterialgüterrechte und Grundstücke erwerben, verwerten sowie veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | St. Gallen | 20.12.2012 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revidas Revisionsgesellschaft AG | St. Gallen | 05.07.2011 | 19.12.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Swiss Rides Ltd
- Swiss Rides SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Swiss Rides AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006025688, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Swiss Rides AG, in Flums, CHE-114.534.260, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 28.02.2022, Publ. 1005415902).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spiegelberg, Thomas, von Aarburg, in Fehraltorf, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bartholet-Ammann, Flavia, von Ronco sopra Ascona, in Tscherlach (Walenstadt), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bartholet, Roland, von Flums, in Tscherlach (Walenstadt), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005415902, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Swiss Rides AG, in Flums, CHE-114.534.260, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 25 vom 04.02.2022, Publ. 1005397784).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Senti, Dr. Christoph, von Flums und Altstätten, in Altstätten, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005397784, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Swiss Rides AG, in Flums, CHE-114.534.260, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2018, S.0, Publ. 4363541).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gubser, Kurt, von Quarten, in Sargans, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sulser, Erich, von Wartau, in Chur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-386.245.531), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BDO AG].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.