Reports for SWISS AIR SERVICES AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SWISS AIR SERVICES AG
- SWISS AIR SERVICES AG is active in the industry «Passenger and cargo transportation, air travel» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Unterseen.
- SWISS AIR SERVICES AG has 2 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 23.04.2020.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-101.810.309.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.02.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Unterseen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.013.803-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.810.309
Sector
Passenger and cargo transportation, air travel
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Betrieb einer Luftfahrtunternehmung sowie der Kauf und Verkauf von Flugzeugen, der Neubau, die Renovation, die Verwaltung sowie der Kauf und Verkauf von Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fuchs + Partner Treuhand AG | Bern | <2004 | 26.04.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Swiss Eagle AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SWISS AIR SERVICES AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004875689, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SWISS AIR SERVICES AG, in Unterseen, CHE-101.810.309, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 12.04.2019, Publ. 1004609378).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Haug, Niklaus, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in Benahavis (ES), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Haug, Adrian Pascal, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in Unterseen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Haug, Andrian Pascal, in Interlaken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Haug-Etterli, Sophie, von Besenbüren, in Unterseen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Etterli, Sophie, in Interlaken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004609378, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SWISS AIR SERVICES AG, in Unterseen, CHE-101.810.309, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 2 vom 04.01.2017, Publ. 3259161).
Domizil neu:
am Lauener 12, 3800 Unterseen.
Publication number: 3259161, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SWISS AIR SERVICES AG, in Unterseen, CHE-101.810.309, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 27.04.2015, Publ. 2119197).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hofstetter, Benjamin, von Langnau im Emmental, in Unterseen, einziges Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Haug, Niklaus, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in Benahavis (ES), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Etterli, Sophie, von Besenbüren, in Interlaken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Haug, Andrian Pascal, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in Interlaken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.