Reports for Sustainable Development Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sustainable Development Holding AG
- Sustainable Development Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Kerns is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Sustainable Development Holding AG is active.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 17.11.2008.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 02.04.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.591.312.
- On the same address there are 8 other active companies registered. These include: BMS Business Management Services AG, CEK AG, Clean Energy Production AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.11.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kerns
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.3.003.318-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.591.312
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bzeweckt den Erwerb, das Halten und Verwalten sowie Veräussern von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen. Die Gesellschaft kann weiter kommerzielle und finanzielle Transaktionen durchführen, mit denen Synergien mit dem Hauptzweck zu erzielen sind, Grundstücke, Wertschrfiten und Lizenzrechte erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, Lizenzen vergeben sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen oder Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sustainable Development Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005998002, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Sustainable Development Holding AG, in Kerns, CHE-114.591.312, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 23.05.2023, Publ. 1005751597).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Simon, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kerns, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Spindler, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Oschatz (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005751597, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Sustainable Development Holding AG, in Sachseln, CHE-114.591.312, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 15.03.2021, Publ. 1005123633).
Statutenänderung:
16.05.2023.
Sitz neu:
Kerns.
Domizil neu:
Chatzenrain 28, 6064 Kerns. Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Amrein, Markus, von Luzern und Schwarzenberg, in Sachseln, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Simon, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kerns, einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005123633, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Sustainable Development Holding AG, in Sachseln, CHE-114.591.312, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 28.12.2009, S.16, Publ. 5415796).
Statutenänderung:
09.03.2021.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bzeweckt den Erwerb, das Halten und Verwalten sowie Veräussern von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen. Die Gesellschaft kann weiter kommerzielle und finanzielle Transaktionen durchführen, mit denen Synergien mit dem Hauptzweck zu erzielen sind, Grundstücke, Wertschrfiten und Lizenzrechte erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, Lizenzen vergeben sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen oder Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen.
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief und E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Nicht publikationspflichtige weitere Statutenänderungen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.