Reports for SUPREME RENENS Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SUPREME RENENS Sàrl
- SUPREME RENENS Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Operation of restaurants». The legal headquarters are in Renens VD.
- The management of the company SUPREME RENENS Sàrl, which was founded on the 17.07.2019, consists of 3 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 01.07.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- SUPREME RENENS Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-230.417.475.
- There are 3 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: CBC Compagnie de Placements Fonciers SA, pomelo Sàrl, Vivràdom Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.07.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Renens (VD)
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.186.164-2
UID/VAT
CHE-230.417.475
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fourniture de services dans les domaines de la restauration (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SUPREME RENENS Sagl
- SUPREME RENENS GmbH
- SUPREME RENENS Ltd liab Co
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SUPREME RENENS Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005510526, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SUPREME RENENS Sàrl, à Renens (VD), CHE-230.417.475 (FOSC du 30.03.2022, p. 0/1005439059). Bekrar Naïme cède 5 parts de CHF 100 à Driouich Mehdi, de France, à Jougne (France), nouvel associé-gérant avec signature collective à deux, avec 5 parts de CHF 100;
Bekrar Naïme reste titulaire de 195 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: HR02-1005439059, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SUPREME RENENS Sàrl, à Renens (VD), CHE-230.417.475 (FOSC du 01.10.2019, p. 0/1004727769). Par décision du Tribunal de l'arrondissement de Lausanne du 17.03.2022, la société a été déclarée en faillite par défaut des parties avec effet à partir du 17.03.2022, à 11h50. Par décision du 21.03.2022, le Président du Tribunal de l'arrondissement de Lausanne a admis la requête en restitution de délai et annulé le prononcé de faillite de la société.
Publication number: HR02-1004727769, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SUPREME RENENS Sàrl, à Renens (VD), CHE-230.417.475 (FOSC du 22.07.2019, p. 0/1004681398). Chaput Théo Camille, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 10 parts de CHF 100 à l'associé-gérant président Bekrar Naïme, désormais titulaire de 200 parts de CHF 100. Signature individuelle est conférée à Fedele Giovanni, d'Italie, à Renens (VD), gérant.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.