Address
Sentiero Alpe Bolla 15
6979 Brè sopra Lugano
Reports for Stile di Vita SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stile di Vita SA
- Stile di Vita SA is active in the industry «Performance of various services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Brè sopra Lugano.
- The management has one active person registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 30.06.2021.
- The company's UID is CHE-109.279.719.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.07.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lugano
Commercial Registry Office
TI
Commercial register number
CH-514.3.025.564-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.279.719
Sector
Performance of various services
Purpose (Original language)
L'esercizio di qualsiasi tipo di attività aziendale quale la consulenza, il commercio, la produzione e la fornitura di ogni genere di servizi e prodotti in ambito salutistico e nutrizionale. Può assumere rappresentanze, acquistare beni e diritti di qualsiasi natura, nonché acquisire o detenere partecipazioni in altre società e imprese aventi scopo analogo.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
P & C CONSULT SA | Bioggio | 02.07.2004 | 25.01.2017 | |
Fidso SA in liquidazione | Roveredo (GR) | <2004 | 01.07.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Infometa SA
- AgroJet SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
CERCATICINO | 17.03.2008 | deleted | 60929/2007 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Stile di Vita SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005234456, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Stile di Vita SA, in Lugano, CHE-109.279.719, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 23 del 02.02.2017, p.0, Pubbl. 3323607).
Nuove azioni:
100 azioni nominative da CHF 1'000.00 [finora: 100 azioni al portatore da CHF 1'000.00]. In data 01.05.2021 le azioni al portatore sono state convertite per legge in azioni nominative. Gli statuti della società non sono ancora stati adeguati;
l'adeguamento deve avvenire in occasione della prossima modifica statutaria.
Publication number: 3323607, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Rettifica dell'iscrizione del registro giornaliero no. 845 del 23.01.2017, pubblicato sul FUSC no. 18 del 26.01.2017. Stile di Vita SA, in Lugano, CHE-109.279.719, società anonima (FUSC no. 18 del 26.01.2017, Pubbl. 3308175).
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Bacchi, Ivan, da Prato (Leventina), in Lugano, amministratore unico, con firma individuale.
Publication number: 3308175, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Infometa SA, in Vezia, CHE-109.279.719, società anonima (FUSC no. 120 del 23.06.2005, p. 13, Pubbl. 2896606).
Statuti modificati:
20.01.2017.
Nuova ragione sociale:
Stile di Vita SA.
Nuova sede:
Lugano.
Nuovo recapito:
Sentiero Alpe Bolla 15, 6979 Brè sopra Lugano.
Nuovo scopo:
L'esercizio di qualsiasi tipo di attività aziendale quale la consulenza, il commercio, la produzione e la fornitura di ogni genere di servizi e prodotti in ambito salutistico e nutrizionale. Può assumere rappresentanze, acquistare beni e diritti di qualsiasi natura, nonché acquisire o detenere partecipazioni in altre società e imprese aventi scopo analogo.
Nuovo organo di pubblicazione:
FUCT e FUSC.
Nuove comunicazioni:
Le comunicazioni della società agli azionisti, se noti, avvengono per lettera raccomandata. Con dichiarazione del 20.01.2017 la società non è soggetta alla revisione ordinaria e rinuncia a una revisione limitata.
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
P & C CONSULT SA, in Manno, ufficio di revisione.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Bacchi, Ivan, da Prato (Leventina), in Lugano, amministratrice unica, con firma individuale [finora: in Rivera, membro con firma individuale].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.