Reports for Stiftung zur Förderung des Antikenmuseums Basel
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung zur Förderung des Antikenmuseums Basel
- Stiftung zur Förderung des Antikenmuseums Basel is currently active and the industry «Operation of libraries and museums». The legal headquarters are in Basel.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The organization was founded on 26.01.1974.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 14.05.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-109.578.978.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Stephan Bernhard Feldhaus,
Bernhard Michael Berger,
Dr. Georg Ulrich Markus Freiherr von Schnurbein,
Dr. Andrea Mario Bignasca
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Stephan Bernhard Feldhaus,
Michel André Pompanin,
Bernhard Michael Berger,
Dr. Georg Ulrich Markus Freiherr von Schnurbein,
Dr. Andrea Mario Bignasca
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.01.1974
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.7.000.447-8
UID/VAT
CHE-109.578.978
Sector
Operation of libraries and museums
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung des Antikenmuseums Basel.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HB&P Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Basel | 11.01.2022 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Basel | 24.08.2015 | 10.01.2022 | |
H. Glättli, Wirtschaftsprüfer | Muttenz | 03.01.2008 | 23.08.2015 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | <2004 | 02.01.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung zur Förderung des Antikenmuseums Basel
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006031523, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Stiftung zur Förderung des Antikenmuseums Basel, in Basel, CHE-109.578.978, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2022, Publ. 1005378265).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dr. Feldhaus, Stephan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005378265, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Stiftung zur Förderung des Antikenmuseums Basel, in Basel, CHE-109.578.978, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 14.03.2017, Publ. 3402349).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
KPMG AG (CHE-154.017.048), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
HB&P Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-103.547.436), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3402349, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Stiftung zur Förderung des Antikenmuseums Basel, in Basel, CHE-109.578.978, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 24.08.2015, Publ. 2334263).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bignasca, Dr. Andrea, von Lugano, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Pompanin, Dipl. Betriebswirtschafter NDS/FH Michel, von Allschwil, in Allschwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.