Reports for Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung
- Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung in Uster is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung is active.
- The organization was founded on 25.05.2009.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 16.01.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung is the following: CHE-114.883.246.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Markus Witschi,
Daniel Binzegger,
Michael Eugen Alfred Weigerstorfer,
Bernard Schüle,
Willi Bühn
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Binzegger,
Michael Eugen Alfred Weigerstorfer,
Willi Bühn,
Alfred Engler
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.05.2009
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Uster
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-400.7.031.686-3
UID/VAT
CHE-114.883.246
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung fördert und erhält das kulturgeschichtliche Bewusstsein der Schweizer Armee. Die Stiftung erfasst, dokumentiert, restauriert, konserviert und unterhält das ihr vom Departement für Verteidigung, Bevölkerungsschutz und Sport (VBS) und ausnahmsweise von Dritten zugewiesene Material der Schweizer Armee.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ACT Audit & Tax AG | Zug | 03.03.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Taxalis Revisions GmbH | Winterthur | 29.05.2009 | 02.03.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005934996, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung, in Uster, CHE-114.883.246, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2023, Publ. 1005727930).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ritter, Ulrich, von Zürich, in Brütten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bühn, Willi, von Zürich, in Würenlos, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Witschi, Markus, von Büren an der Aare, in Büren an der Aare, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005727930, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung, in Uster, CHE-114.883.246, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 03.03.2023, Publ. 1005692010).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ackermann, Markus, von Wolfwil, in Hindelbank, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Binzegger, Daniel, von Baar, in Baar, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bühn, Willi, von Zürich, in Würenlos, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ritter, Ulrich, von Zürich, in Brütten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Weigerstorfer, Michael Eugen Alfred, von Zollikon, in Wohlen (AG), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1005692010, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Historisches Armeematerial Führungsunterstützung, in Uster, CHE-114.883.246, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 19.04.2022, Publ. 1005452392).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Taxalis Revisions GmbH (CHE-102.627.647), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ACT Audit & Tax AG (CHE-114.287.848), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.