Reports for Stiftung Griechisch-Orthodoxe Kirche Zürich
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Griechisch-Orthodoxe Kirche Zürich
- Stiftung Griechisch-Orthodoxe Kirche Zürich from Zürich operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- The management has 9 active persons registered.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 05.11.2019. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The organization Stiftung Griechisch-Orthodoxe Kirche Zürich is registered under the UID CHE-110.202.037.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Georgios Pothos,
Catherine Foskolos,
Dionysios Kopitsis,
Nikolaos Lavvas,
Dr. Dimitrios Tonis
newest authorized signatories
Georgios Pothos,
Catherine Foskolos,
Dionysios Kopitsis,
Nikolaos Lavvas,
Dr. Dimitrios Tonis
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.04.1978
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.904.247-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.202.037
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Bereitstellung von Mitteln für die Ausübung der griechisch-orthodoxen Seelsorge, die Errichtung und den Unterhalt der für den Gottesdienst und die Seelsorge benötigten Gebäude und Einrichtungen für die griechisch-orthodoxen Gläubigen in dem vom Metropoliten bestimmten Teil der Schweiz.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Griechisch-Orthodoxe Kirche Zürich
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004752243, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Griechisch-Orthodoxe Kirche Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-110.202.037, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 19.12.2018, Publ. 1004524471).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lavvas, Nikolaos, von Thalwil, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Pothos, Georgios, von Pregny-Chambésy, in Genève, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1004524471, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Griechisch-Orthodoxe Kirche Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-110.202.037, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 23.01.2018, Publ. 4007517).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pavlides, Pavlos, griechischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pothos, Georgios, von Pregny-Chambésy, in Genève, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 4007517, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Griechisch-Orthodoxe Kirche Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-110.202.037, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2017, Publ. 3292883).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kopitsis, Dionysios, von Wohlen (AG), in Niederrohrdorf, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Foskolos, Catherine, von Zürich, in Zürich, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lavvas, Nikolaos, von Thalwil, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.