Reports for Stiftung Gallarte
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Gallarte
- Stiftung Gallarte is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Mollis.
- Stiftung Gallarte was founded on 15.04.1998.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 23.06.2022.
- In the commercial register the organization Stiftung Gallarte is registered under the UID CHE-110.405.333.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.04.1998
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Nord
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.7.003.495-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.405.333
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung kulturellen Schaffens. Es können insbesondere Beiträge an Künstler im In- und Ausland im Rahmen des Stiftungszwecks ausgerichtet werden. Im besonderen kann dies folgende Aufgaben beinhalten: Organisation von Ausstellungen und kulturellen Anlässen; Benutzung der speziell für die Durchführung von Ausstellungen und kulturellen Anlässen hergerichteten Räume im Wohnhaus der Stifter, Seelmess 16, 8753 Mollis; Unterstützung von kulturellen Anlässen; Durchführung von Kunstwettbewerben und Vergabe von Kunstpreisen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Gallarte
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005502704, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Stiftung Gallarte, in Glarus Nord, CHE-110.405.333, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2011, S.0, Publ. 6242002).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Handelsregister des Kantons Glarus, in Glarus.
Publication number: 6242002, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Stiftung Gallarte, in Mollis, CH-160.7.003.495-6, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 26.03.2009, S. 10, Publ. 4943628).
Sitz neu:
Glarus Nord. Infolge Fusion per 01.01.2011 der bisherigen Gemeinden Bilten, Niederurnen, Oberurnen, Näfels, Mollis, Filzbach, Obstalden und Mühlehorn zur Einheitsgemeinde Glarus Nord, musste als neuer Sitz die neue politische Gemeinde Glarus Nord von Amtes wegen im Handelsregister eingetragen werden.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gallati, Hans-Rudolf, von Glarus Nord, in Mollis (Glarus Nord), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher:von Mollis, in Mollis];
Gallati-Berlinger, Ruth, von Glarus Nord, in Mollis (Glarus Nord), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher:von Mollis, in Mollis].
Publication number: 4943628, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Stiftung Gallarte, in Mollis, CH-160.7.003.495-6, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 19.03.2008, S. 7, Publ. 4393396).
Urkundenänderung:
19.03.2009. Die Stiftung wurde mit Verfügung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 20.03.2009 von der Pflicht befreit, eine Revisionsstelle zu bezeichnen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Staub, Martin, von Bilten, in Schwanden GL, Kontrollstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.