Address
c/o Gemeindeverwaltung Obergoms
Bahnhofstrasse 1
3988 Obergesteln
Reports for Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke
- Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Obergesteln. Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- There are 7 active persons registered in the management.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 30.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-110.011.738.
- Next to the organization Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke there are 7 other active companies with an identical address. These include: ANOG Anergienetz Obergoms AG, DFB-Dampfbahn-Furka-Bergstrecke AG, Immobilien Gletsch AG.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Andreas Kleeb,
Kathrin Renggli,
Peter Hodel-Schmid,
Prof. Peter Friedrich Amacher,
Dr. Franz Mattig
newest authorized signatories
Andreas Kleeb,
Kathrin Renggli,
Peter Hodel-Schmid,
Prof. Peter Friedrich Amacher,
Dr. Franz Mattig
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.07.2002
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Obergoms
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.7.011.365-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.011.738
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der Dampfbahn Furka-Bergsterecke im Interesse der Sicherung dieses historischen Kulturgutes von Nationaler Bedeutung und als Beitrag zur nachhaltigen Entwicklung der Regionen Goms und Ursern. Äufnet und verwaltet einen Dotationsfond für Spenden und Sponsoren zur Finanzierung der Instandsetzung und Instandhaltung der für den Betrieb der Dampfbahn notwendigen Bauten, Anlagen und Transportmittel. Hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt keinerlei Erwerbszwecke.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 14.04.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006097376, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke, in Obergoms, CHE-110.011.738, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 12.07.2024, Publ. 1006083562).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hamburger, Josef Benjamin, von Lugano, in Rengg (Entlebuch), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1006083562, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke, in Obergoms, CHE-110.011.738, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 181 vom 17.09.2021, Publ. 1005293920).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Riedwyl, Peter, von Kehrsatz, in Neuenkirch, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meiner, Hans, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kissling, Franz Albert, von Olten, in Bern, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wiederkehr, Jörg, von Zürich, in Dänikon ZH (Dänikon), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schaller, Heinz Ernst, von Luzern, in Sursee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kleeb, Andreas, von Zug, in Zug, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Amacher, Peter, von Brienzwiler, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hodel, Peter, von Zug, in Zug, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Renggli, Kathrin, von Rohrbach, in Unterägeri, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005293920, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung Furka-Bergstrecke, in Obergoms, CHE-110.011.738, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 02.04.2020, Publ. 1004864997).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kleeb, Andreas, von Zug, in Zug, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schaller, Heinz Ernst, von Luzern, in Sursee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.