Reports for Stiftung für Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung für Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität
- Stiftung für Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität with its legal headquarters in Langenthal is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Stiftung für Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität is active.
- There are 7 active persons registered in the management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 16.01.2024.
- The organization's UID is CHE-110.386.919.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Maria Drechsler,
Marianne Streiff-Feller,
Nathan Flavio Keiser,
Richard Hebeisen,
Dr. René Hefti
newest authorized signatories
Maria Drechsler,
Marianne Streiff-Feller,
Nathan Flavio Keiser,
Richard Hebeisen,
Dr. René Hefti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.02.1992
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Langenthal
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.7.008.275-4
UID/VAT
CHE-110.386.919
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt in gemeinnütziger Weise die Förderung wissenschaftlicher Forschung auf dem Gebiet von Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität (Spiritual Care) und andererseits die Aus-, Weiter- und Fortbildung von Fachpersonen aus den Fachgebieten Medizin, Pflege, Psychologie und Psychotherapie, Sozialarbeit und Seelsorge (Theologie). Zu diesem Zweck betreibt die Stiftung das Forschungsinstitut für Spiritualität und Gesundheit (FISG) und richtet Beiträge an Forschungsarbeiten aus. Der Stiftungsrat kann einen wissenschaftlichen Beirat einsetzen. Die Stiftung verfolgt weder wirtschaftliche Ziele, noch erstrebt sie materielle Gewinne.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Unico Treuhand AG | Burgdorf | 30.10.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung für Religionspsychologie und Religionspsychopathologie SRP
- Stiftung für Religionspsychologie und Religionspsychopathologie
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung für Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005935119, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung für Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität, in Langenthal, CHE-110.386.919, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 11.12.2023, Publ. 1005906044).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Eidgenössisches Departement des Innern (EDI).
Publication number: HR02-1005906044, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung für Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität, in Langenthal, CHE-110.386.919, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 09.12.2020, Publ. 1005042940).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grylka, Werner, von Spreitenbach, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Seiler, Albrecht Dr., deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Laufenburg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keiser, Nathan, von Grosswangen, in Bottenwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Streiff-Feller, Marianne, von Thun, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Drechsler, Maria, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Oensingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005042940, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung für Gesundheit, Religiosität und Spiritualität, in Langenthal, CHE-110.386.919, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 30.09.2020, Publ. 1004988938).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gebert, Manuela, von Eschenbach (SG), in Monteggio, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hefti, René Dr., von Glarus, in Langenthal, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Grylka, Werner, von Spreitenbach, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Aarwangen];
Hebeisen, Richard, von Eggiwil, in Urmein, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.