Address
Asylstrasse 37
3550 Langnau im Emmental
Reports for Stiftung BWO
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung BWO
- Stiftung BWO is active in the industry «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Langnau im Emmental.
- The organization was founded on 12.12.1997 and has 9 persons in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 26.02.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the organization Stiftung BWO is registered under the UID CHE-105.994.898.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Peter Schär,
Martin Pfeuti,
Thomas Michael Weber,
Christine Elsbeth Schär von Steiger,
Rea Nejedly
newest authorized signatories
Christine Elsbeth Schär von Steiger,
Johann Sommer,
Kathrin Wanner,
Cornelia Schwarzenbach
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.12.1997
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Langnau im Emmental
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.7.000.089-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.994.898
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Wahrung der Interessen von Menschen mit Beeinträchtigungen, insbesondere der Mensch mit einer geistigen Behinderung, und die Förderung aller Massnahmen für ihre Eingliederung in die Gesellschaft. Sie betreibt dafür eine heilpädagogische Schule, Wohngruppen, Beschäftigungsstätten, eine Werkstatt und einen Ausbildungsbereich für Menschen mit Beeinträchtigungen. Sie kann weitere solche oder andere, dem Hauptzweck dienende Einrichtungen errichten oder auch solche schliessen. Zur Erreichung des Zweckes arbeitet sie mit Ämtern und Behörden sowie privaten Institutionen oder Personen zusammen, welche die Förderung von Menschen mit Beeinträchtigungen unterstützen. Sie kann Grundstücke erwerben, mieten oder veräussern und überhaupt Geschäfte eingehen, die den Zweck fördern. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt keinerlei Erwerbszweck.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gfeller + Partner AG | Langenthal | 05.07.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhandbüro Sutter AG | Langnau im Emmental | 22.12.2006 | 04.07.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Behindertenwerke Oberemmental
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung BWO
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005970227, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung BWO, in Langnau im Emmental, CHE-105.994.898, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 23.05.2023, Publ. 1005751504).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Naville, Robert, von Zumikon und Genève, in Uetikon am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schär, Peter, von Rüegsau, in Kirchberg BE, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005751504, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung BWO, in Langnau im Emmental, CHE-105.994.898, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 21.07.2020, Publ. 1004941553).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Furter, Martin, von Staufen, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Luginbühl, Beat, von Bowil, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfeuti, Martin, von Schwarzenburg, in Kehrsatz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Weber, Thomas, von Beinwil am See, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004941553, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung BWO, in Langnau im Emmental, CHE-105.994.898, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 05.07.2017, Publ. 3623715).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Friedli, Johannes, von Trachselwald, in Basel, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwarzenbach, Cornelia, von Rüschlikon, in Bern, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Worb, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schär von Steiger, Christine Elsbeth, von Bern und Walterswil (BE), in Burgdorf, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Furter, Martin, von Staufen, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Melchnau, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Luginbühl, Beat, von Bowil, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Naville, Robert, von Zumikon und Genève, in Uetikon am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: von Zumikon und Genf, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Nejedly, Rea, von Kreuzlingen, in Worb, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.