Reports for steyer antriebstechnik ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout steyer antriebstechnik ag
- steyer antriebstechnik ag from Arbon operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities» and is active.
- The management of the company steyer antriebstechnik ag consists of 2 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 08.11.2012. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company steyer antriebstechnik ag is registered under the UID CHE-107.321.227.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.10.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Arbon
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.045.324-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.321.227
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Herstellung und Handel mit Regelmotoren jedwelcher Art, insbesondere Entwicklung und Handel mit Produkten im Bereich der Antriebstechnik und Steuerungsbau im internationalen und nationalen Markt; die Gesellschaft kann Rechte und Patente aller Art erwerben, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
awit wirtschaftsprüfer AG | Arbon | <2004 | 29.05.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: steyer antriebstechnik ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6922092, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
steyer antriebstechnik ag, in Arbon, CH-320.3.045.324-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 30.05.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6695630).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Valentinelli, Nadia, von Marbach SG, in Arbon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Neuenschwander, Roger, von Eggiwil, in Scherzingen (Münsterlingen), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lüchinger, Jakob, von Oberriet SG, in Roggwil TG, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 6695630, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
steyer antriebstechnik ag, in Arbon, CH-320.3.045.324-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 07.09.2009, S. 16, Publ. 5233230). Die Gesellschaft hat mit Erklärung vom 21.05.2012 auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
awit wirtschaftsprüfer AG, in Arbon (CH-320.3.043.524-6), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 5233230, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
steyer antriebstechnik ag, in Arbon, CH-320.3.045.324-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 14.11.2008, S. 16, Publ. 4733266).
Statutenänderung:
26.08.2009.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
[Die Bestimmung über die Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme bei der Gründung vom 22.10.1998 ist aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft der im Handelsregister eingetragenen Einzelfirma Steyer Antriebstechnik, in Rorschacherberg, gemäss Übernahmebilanz per 30.06.1998 mit Aktiven von CHF 3'221'312.75 und Passiven von CHF 1'026'120.02, wofür 2'500 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.-- ausgegeben und CHF 1'945'192.73 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Adressen bzw. durch Veröffentlichung im SHAB.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steyer, Peter, von Arbon, in Arbon, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüchinger, Jakob, von Oberriet SG, in Roggwil TG, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Arbon, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Neuenschwander, Roger, von Eggiwil, in Scherzingen (Münsterlingen), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Kreuzlingen, ohne eingetragene Funktion].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.