Reports for SoWatch GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SoWatch GmbH
- SoWatch GmbH has its legal headquarters in Aarau 1, is active and operates in the sector «Other social services».
- The management has one active person registered.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 25.05.2020.
- SoWatch GmbH is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-144.425.859.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.07.2014
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarau
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.038.532-9
UID/VAT
CHE-144.425.859
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Anbieten von Konzepten, Beratungen, Schulungen und Sachverhaltsabklärungen für Gemeinwesen und Organisationen im Bereich Sozialinspektionen sowie zur Aufklärung und Prävention von Sozialleistungsmissbrauch; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Patente, andere Schutzrechte, Lizenzen sowie Immobilien erwerben, verwalten, verwerten oder veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SoWatch GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004895905, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SoWatch GmbH, in Aarau, CHE-144.425.859, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2019, Publ. 1004730743).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bohren, Ulrich, von Grindelwald, in Basel, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wilden, Oliver, von Mümliswil-Ramiswil, in Liestal, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004730743, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SoWatch GmbH, in Aarau, CHE-144.425.859, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 23.07.2014, S.0, Publ. 1629099).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wilden, Oliver, von Mümliswil-Ramiswil, in Liestal, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Laufen].
Publication number: 1629099, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SoWatch GmbH, in Aarau, CHE-144.425.859, Igelweid 1, 5001 Aarau, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
07.07.2014.
Zweck:
Anbieten von Konzepten, Beratungen, Schulungen und Sachverhaltsabklärungen für Gemeinwesen und Organisationen im Bereich Sozialinspektionen sowie zur Aufklärung und Prävention von Sozialleistungsmissbrauch;
kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Patente, andere Schutzrechte, Lizenzen sowie Immobilien erwerben, verwalten, verwerten oder veräussern.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00. Das Stammkapital ist bei der Gründung vollständig liberiert worden. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Vinkulierung:
Vom Gesetz abweichende Modalitäten für die Abtretung von Stammanteilen gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 07.07.2014 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Wilden, Oliver, von Mümliswil-Ramiswil, in Laufen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Bohren, Ulrich, von Grindelwald, in Basel, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.