Reports for Sotridec S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sotridec S.A.
- Sotridec S.A. is active in the industry «Waste collection, treatment and disposal» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Nyon.
- The management of the company Sotridec S.A., which was founded on the 10.11.1986, consists of 5 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 22.12.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-100.734.597.
- There are 5 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Challande & fils Holding Sàrl, Challande et fils S.A., Challande Immobilier Sàrl.
Management (5)
newest board members
David Martini,
Frederic Michoud,
Frédéric Voisin,
Christophe Challande
newest authorized signatories
David Martini,
Frederic Michoud,
Frédéric Voisin,
Bruno Lopes,
Christophe Challande
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.11.1986
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Nyon
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.076.972-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.734.597
Sector
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Tri et revalorisation de tout déchet de chantier et industriel.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidinter SA | Lausanne | 12.05.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Cabinet Fiscal et Comptable, J.-F. Meillard | Montilliez | 17.06.2009 | 11.05.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sotridec SA
- Nacel Service SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sotridec S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005919150, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sotridec S.A., à Nyon, CHE-100.734.597 (FOSC du 12.05.2020, p. 0/1004887965). Perrin Christian et Challande René ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Martini David est nommé secrétaire. Michoud Frédéric, de France, à Thonon-les-Bains (France), et Voisin Frédéric, de France, à Saint-George, sont membres du conseil d'administration signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004887965, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sotridec S.A., à Nyon, CHE-100.734.597 (FOSC du 16.10.2019, p. 0/1004739178). Cabinet Fiscal et Comptable, J.-F. Meillard (CH-550-0028084-5) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fidinter SA (CHE-105.925.319), à Lausanne.
Publication number: HR02-1004739178, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sotridec S.A., à Nyon, CHE-100.734.597 (FOSC du 29.10.2018, p. 0/1004486133). Martini David, qui n'est plus directeur, reste administrateur et continue à signer collectivement à deux. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Lopes Bruno, du Portugal, à Duillier.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.