Address
c/o F. Steiner
Rainstrasse 55, Mostelberg
6417 Sattel
Reports for Sopem AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sopem AG
- Sopem AG has its legal headquarters in Sattel, is active and operates in the sector «Fiduciary services».
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 02.05.1975.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 14.09.2010, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Sopem AG is the following: CHE-102.862.823.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.05.1975
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sattel
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.006.143-8
UID/VAT
CHE-102.862.823
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verwaltung von Vermögen, Finanzierungen, Gewährung von Darlehen, Vermittlungen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften oder Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société de Prospection et d'Exploitation de Minéraux marins Sopem SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sopem AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5810960, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Sopem AG in Sattel, CH-130.0.006.143-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 02.09.1998, S. 6063).
Statutenänderung:
9.08.2010.
Zweck neu:
Verwaltung von Vermögen, Finanzierungen, Gewährung von Darlehen, Vermittlungen;
kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften oder Dritte eingehen.
Aktien neu:
500 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.-- [bisher: 500 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 100]. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre durch Brief oder Telefax. [Weitere Statutenänderungen sind nicht publikationspflichtig.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 27.6.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Marti, Nicole, von Kilchberg BL, in Forch, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marti-Steiner, Nicole, von Schwyz, in Forch, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Sopem AG, in Sattel, Verwaltung von Vermögen usw. (SHAB Nr.143 vom 28.7.1992, S.3544).
Revisionsstelle:
Nicole Marti, von Kilchberg, in Forch.
Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Société de Prospection et d'Exploitation de Minéraux marins Sopem SA, in Hünenberg , Handel mit Waren aller Art usw. (SHAB Nr.242 vom 13.12.1991, S.5361). Diese Firma wird infolge Sitzverlegung nach Sattel (SHAB Nr.143 vom 28.7.1992, S.3544) im Handelsregister des Kantons Zug von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.