Address
c/o René Frommherz
Chemin Charles-Giron 8
1800 Vevey
Reports for Solatès SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Solatès SA
- Solatès SA with its legal headquarters in Vevey is active. Solatès SA operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting».
- The management of the company Solatès SA, which was founded on the 11.02.1977, consists of 2 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 16.09.2020, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Solatès SA is registered under the UID CHE-107.029.117.
- Companies with an identical address: Adri Clés 24/24 7/7 Altobelli Adriano, Sambas Sàrl, Shervin Properties SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.02.1977
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Vevey
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.076.264-3
UID/VAT
CHE-107.029.117
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but d'effectuer toute activité dans les domaines de l'administration, du conseil et de la gestion d'entreprises; la gestion d'hôtels, de restaurants et d'autres établissements publics; l'exploitation de magasins d'alimentation et le commerce de toute marchandise (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PME revision et expertises SA en liquidation | Lausanne | 20.04.2011 | 21.07.2016 | |
FIDUCIAIRE CONTAGEST S.à r.l. | Lausanne | 31.01.2007 | 17.06.2010 | |
BDO Sofirom SA | Epalinges | <2004 | 11.01.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Solatès S.A.
- Grains Dumoulin SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Solatès SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004980065, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Solatès SA, à Vevey, CHE-107.029.117 (FOSC du 01.09.2016, p. 0/3033067).
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Frommherz Anouk, de Magliaso, à Lausanne, présidente.
Publication number: 3033067, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Solatès SA, à Vevey, CHE-107.029.117 (FOSC du 22.07.2016, p. 0/2969545). Selon déclaration du 23 août 2016, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Publication number: 2969545, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Solatès S.A., à Montreux, CHE-107.029.117 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 12 juillet 2016.
Nouvelle graphie de la raison de commerce:
Solatès SA. Siège transféré à Vevey.
Nouvelle adresse:
chemin Charles-Giron 8, c/o René Frommherz, 1800 Vevey.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but d'effectuer toute activité dans les domaines de l'administration, du conseil et de la gestion d'entreprises;
la gestion d'hôtels, de restaurants et d'autres établissements publics;
l'exploitation de magasins d'alimentation et le commerce de toute marchandise (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou courrier électronique. Noirot Suzanne n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. La procuration de Dumoulin Caroline est éteinte.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Frommherz René, de Magliaso, à Vevey. PME revision et expertises SA (CH-550-0081592-4) n'est plus organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.