Address
c/o Rytz & Cie SA
Avenue Alfred Cortot 7B
1260 Nyon
Reports for Société immobilière Les Prés SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société immobilière Les Prés SA
- Société immobilière Les Prés SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Nyon. Société immobilière Les Prés SA belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 20.07.1984 and has 2 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 07.01.2021.
- The company Société immobilière Les Prés SA is registered under the UID CHE-100.371.796.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.07.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Nyon
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.015.994-2
UID/VAT
CHE-100.371.796
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toute affaire immobilière.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire AR Conseils SA | Nyon | 14.03.2011 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Société Fiduciaire 'Lemano' SA en liquidation | Lausanne | <2004 | 13.03.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société immobilière Les Prés S.A.
- Société immobilière Les Près SA
- SI Les Prés SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société immobilière Les Prés SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005066192, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société immobilière Les Prés S.A., à Nyon, CHE-100.371.796 (FOSC du 21.01.2015, p. 0/1943147). Statuts modifiés le 10 décembre 2020.
Nouvelle graphie de la raison de commerce:
Société immobilière Les Prés SA. Les 50 actions au porteur de CHF 1'000, formant l'entier du capital-actions, sont converties en 50 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000. Wyss Jacques, qui n'est plus secrétaire, est nommé président. Morand Gérald, qui n'est plus président, est nommé secrétaire.
Publication number: 1943147, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société immobilière Les Prés S.A., à Nyon, CHE-100.371.796 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Rectificatif:
l'inscription n° 1418 du 19.12.1995 (FOSC du 04.01.1996, p. 39) est rectifiée en ce sens que Morand Gérard se nomme Morand Gérald. L'administrateur Morand Gérald est nommé président.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Wyss Jacques, de Hubersdorf, à Vufflens-le-Château, secrétaire.
Publication number: 6074572, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société immobilière Les Prés S.A., à Nyon, CH-550-1015994-2 (FOSC du 03.11.2000, p. 7498). Fiduciaire François Gillièron n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
ALR Fiduciaire A.L.Rummel SA (CH-550-0108560-9), à Nyon.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.