Reports for Société immobilière La Perche S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société immobilière La Perche S.A.
- Société immobilière La Perche S.A. is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Porrentruy.
- The management of the company Société immobilière La Perche S.A. consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 19.01.1960.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 18.06.2021.
- In the commercial register the company Société immobilière La Perche S.A. is registered under the UID CHE-102.599.318.
Management (3)
newest board members
Thierry Linder,
Pascal Louis Joseph Beuret,
Yann-Amaël Aubert
newest authorized signatories
Thierry Linder,
Pascal Louis Joseph Beuret,
Yann-Amaël Aubert
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.01.1960
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Porrentruy
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-677.3.000.290-5
UID/VAT
CHE-102.599.318
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'achat, la construction, la location, la gérance, et, d'une manière générale, la mise en valeur de propriétés immobilières et leur revente en bloc ou en détail. La société peut effectuer toutes les opérations financières ou commerciales, mobilières ou immobilières, en relation avec le but principal, s'intéresser directement ou indirectement à toutes affaires similaires.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société immobilière La Perche SA
- SI La Perche SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société immobilière La Perche S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005222560, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Société immobilière La Perche S.A., à Porrentruy, CHE-102.599.318, société anonyme (No. FOSC 37 du 23.02.2021, Publ. 1005108363).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Parietti, Pierre, de Porrentruy, à Porrentruy, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Linder, Thierry, de Reichenbach im Kandertal, à Lugnorre (Mont-Vully), président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux];
Beuret, Pascal Louis Joseph, de Les Breuleux, à Courtételle, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005108363, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Société immobilière La Perche S.A., à Porrentruy, CHE-102.599.318, société anonyme (No. FOSC 232 du 29.11.2017, Publ. 3900271).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Maillard, Dominique Georges Daniel, de Basse-Allaine, à Delémont, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Aubert, Yann-Amaël, de Le Chenit, à Neuchâtel, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Linder, Thierry, de Reichenbach im Kandertal, à Lugnorre (Mont-Vully), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3900271, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Société immobilière La Perche S.A., à Porrentruy, CHE-102.599.318, société anonyme (No. FOSC 191 du 02.10.2008, Publ. 4675298).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Maillard, Dominique Georges Daniel, de Basse-Allaine, à Delémont, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: Maillard, Dominique, de Courtemaîche, à Pleigne].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.