Address
c/o Marc Aellen
Route des Deux-Villages 38
1806 St-Légier-La Chiésaz
Reports for Société des copropriétaires de la montagne de Paccot SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société des copropriétaires de la montagne de Paccot SA
- Société des copropriétaires de la montagne de Paccot SA has its legal headquarters in St-Légier-La Chiésaz, is active and operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Société des copropriétaires de la montagne de Paccot SA consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 15.02.1922.
- The last commercial register change was made on 07.05.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-103.213.998.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Marc-Eric Aellen,
Alexandre Furrer,
Micheline Asfa-Vaudroz,
Philippe Bonjour
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.02.1922
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Blonay - Saint-Légier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.119.481-0
UID/VAT
CHE-103.213.998
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Opérations immobilières.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société des Copropriétaires de la Montagne de Paccot SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société des copropriétaires de la montagne de Paccot SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006027037, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société des copropriétaires de la montagne de Paccot SA, à Blonay - Saint-Légier, CHE-103.213.998 (FOSC du 24.04.2024, p. 0/1006017016).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route des Deux-Villages 38, c/o Marc Aellen, 1806 St-Légier-La Chiésaz.
Publication number: HR02-1006017016, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société des copropriétaires de la montagne de Paccot SA, à Blonay - Saint-Légier, CHE-103.213.998 (FOSC du 29.02.2024, p. 0/1005974283). Dupraz Jean n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Aellen Marc, qui est nommé président, signe désormais individuellement.
Publication number: HR02-1005974283, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société des copropriétaires de la montagne de Paccot SA, à Blonay - Saint-Légier, CHE-103.213.998 (FOSC du 22.04.2022, p. 0/1005456854). Furrer Alexandre, de Bolken, à Blonay - Saint-Légier, est membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.