Address
Chemin du Val-d'Angrogne 10
1012 Lausanne
Reports for Société coopérative d'habitation Bellerive
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative d'habitation Bellerive
- Société coopérative d'habitation Bellerive is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Lausanne. Société coopérative d'habitation Bellerive belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 18.01.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-103.998.135.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Lidia Mompart,
Barbara Bugno Grandchamp,
Bernard Faillettaz,
Michel-Marc Hennemann,
René Scheuner
newest authorized signatories
Lidia Mompart,
Barbara Bugno Grandchamp,
Bernard Faillettaz,
Michel-Marc Hennemann,
René Scheuner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.11.1959
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.005.810-5
UID/VAT
CHE-103.998.135
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fournir à ses membres des logements sûrs à des prix favorables et les conserver.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
mafidu.com fiduciaire SA | Montanaire | 24.11.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Favre & Perreaud SA | Lausanne | 09.06.2010 | 23.11.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société coopérative d'habitations Bellerive
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative d'habitation Bellerive
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005938233, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative d'habitation Bellerive, à Lausanne, CHE-103.998.135 (FOSC du 24.11.2023, p. 0/1005893673). Mompart Santiso Lidia se nomme désormais Mompart Lidia.
Publication number: HR02-1005893673, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative d'habitation Bellerive, à Lausanne, CHE-103.998.135 (FOSC du 06.12.2022, p. 0/1005621298). Fiduciaire Favre & Perreaud SA (CH-550-0081512-9) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
mafidu.com fiduciaire SA (CHE-277.445.214), à Montanaire.
Publication number: HR02-1005621298, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative d'habitation Bellerive, à Lausanne, CHE-103.998.135 (FOSC du 13.09.2016, p. 0/3052491). Matthey Jean-Luc n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Bugno Grandchamp Barbara, qui n'est plus secrétaire, est nommée présidente. Mompart Santiso Lidia, de Ecublens (VD), à Romanel-sur-Lausanne, est membre secrétaire du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.