Address
c/o Daniel Bard
Chemin du Vugy 13
1684 Mézières FR
Reports for Société coopérative de secours mutuels de Mézières
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative de secours mutuels de Mézières
- Société coopérative de secours mutuels de Mézières has its legal headquarters in Mézières FR, is active and operates in the sector «Other social services».
- The management of the organization Société coopérative de secours mutuels de Mézières consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 13.12.1887.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 23.04.2020. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Société coopérative de secours mutuels de Mézières is registered in the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-102.440.480.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Francis Morel,
Vincent Dénervaud,
Cédric Dénervaud,
Frédéric Dumas,
Daniel Bard
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.12.1887
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Mézières (FR)
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.350.095-4
UID/VAT
CHE-102.440.480
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
De favoriser ou de garantir, par une action commune, des intérêts économiques déterminés de ses membres, dans un esprit de confraternité et de prévoyance, et une garantie mutuelle de secours en cas de maladies ou d'infirmités, rendant le malade incapable de travailler. Toutefois il ne sera pas accordé de secours pour simple cas de vieillesse.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société de secours mutuels de Mézières
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative de secours mutuels de Mézières
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004875887, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société coopérative de secours mutuels de Mézières, à Mézières (FR), CHE-102.440.480 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826).
Personne radiée:
Dénervaud Bernard, membre du comité, sans signature.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Dénervaud Vincent, de Le Flon, à Romont FR, membre du comité, sans signature.
Publication number: 6767378, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société de secours mutuels de Mézières, à Mézières (FR), CH-217-0350095-4, développer l'esprit de confraternité et de prévoyance, etc. (FOSC du 10.06.1991, p. 2499).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin du Vugy 13, c/o Daniel Bard, 1684 Mézières FR.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Société coopérative de secours mutuels de Mézières. Statuts modifiés le 15.05.2012.
Nouveau but:
de favoriser ou de garantir, par une action commune, des intérêts économiques déterminés de ses membres, dans un esprit de confraternité et de prévoyance, et une garantie mutuelle de secours en cas de maladies ou d'infirmités, rendant le malade incapable de travailler. Toutefois il ne sera pas accordé de secours pour simple cas de vieillesse.
Communication aux membres:
par écrit.
Obligation de fournir des prestations:
selon statuts. Selon l'art. 87, al. 1, lit. j ORC, l'inscription relative à l'exonération de la responsabilité personnelle n'a plus sa raison d'être, partant, elle est radiée. Pittet Raymond, inscrit sans signature, n'est plus vice-président. Dumas Raymond n'est plus secrétaire caissier, sa signature est radiée. Dumas Frédéric, de et à Mézières (FR), est nommé vice-président, sans signature. Dénervaud Cédric, de Mézières (FR), à Villariaz, est nommé secrétaire caissier, avec signature collective à deux. Selon déclaration du 15.06.2012, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Société de secours mutuels de Mézières, à Mézières , société coopérative (FOSC du 20.8.1956, no194, p.2138). André Pittet et Paul Golliard ont démissionné. Leur signature est radiée. Daniel Bard, de Semsales, à Mézières, a été nommé président, avec signature collective à deux. Raymond Dumas, membre du comité, de et à Mézières, a été nommé secrétaire-caissier, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.