Reports for Société coopérative d'alpage d'Aubonne
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société coopérative d'alpage d'Aubonne
- Société coopérative d'alpage d'Aubonne with its legal headquarters in Aubonne is a Cooperative from the sector «Associations and federations». Société coopérative d'alpage d'Aubonne is active.
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 09.07.2021.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-102.403.160.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Louis Schmid,
Laurent Guignard,
Christoph Hostettler,
Steeve Reymond,
Mareck Oppliger
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.12.1917
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Aubonne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.172.503-9
UID/VAT
CHE-102.403.160
Sector
Associations and federations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Favoriser l'élevage du bétail bovin par l'exploitation de pâturages.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société d'alpage d'Aubonne
- Syndicat d'élevage d'Aubonne.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société coopérative d'alpage d'Aubonne
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005245714, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative d'alpage d'Aubonne, à Aubonne, CHE-102.403.160 (FOSC du 06.03.2020, p. 0/1004847043). Badertscher Hans-Jörg n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Guignard Laurent est nommé caissier avec signature collective à deux, pas avec Oppliger Mareck. Schmid Louis, de Niedermuhlern, à Villars-sous-Yens, est membre du conseil d'administration sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004847043, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative d'alpage d'Aubonne, à Aubonne, CHE-102.403.160 (FOSC du 15.11.2016, p. 0/3163085). Chevalaz Luc, dont la signature est radiée, et Luthi Hugo, sans signature, ne sont plus administrateurs. L'administrateur Hostettler Christophe, qui n'est plus secrétaire, est nommé président et signe désormais collectivement à deux sans restriction.
Nouveaux administrateurs:
Oppliger Mareck, de Sigriswil, à Essertines-sur-Rolle, avec signature collective à deux, toutefois pas avec Badertscher Hans-Jörg, secrétaire, et Reymond Steeve, de Gimel, à Montherod, sans signature.
Publication number: 3163085, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Société coopérative d'alpage d'Aubonne, à Aubonne, CHE-102.403.160 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle adresse:
chemin de la Croix 3, 1170 Aubonne. Muller Eric, dont la signature est radiée, et Oppliger Gilbert, inscrit sans signature, ne sont plus administrateurs. Chevalaz Luc, qui n'est plus secrétaire, est nommé président et continue à signer collectivement à deux. Badertscher Hans-Jörg continue à signer collectivement à deux, désormais pas avec Hostettler Christophe.
Nouveaux administrateurs:
Hostettler Christophe, de Guggisberg, à Montherod, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux, toutefois pas avec Badertscher Hans-Jörg, et Guignard Laurent, de Vaulion, à Gimel, sans signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.