Reports for SLYNET AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SLYNET AG
- SLYNET AG has its legal headquarters in Lupfig and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «IT services».
- The management of the company SLYNET AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 21.02.1997.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 12.07.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-103.560.000.
- Companies with the same address as SLYNET AG: ABC-Pack, Inh. Huber, Antalis AG, Best Demontagen GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.02.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lupfig
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.021.213-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.560.000
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Informatikbereich, befasst sich mit der Softwareherstellung, der Betriebsberatung, der Rationalisierung von Unternehmen, dem Betrieb von Rechenzentren sowie dem Verkaufen von Hard- und Software-Produkten; kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen erwerben, halten, verwalten und veräussern, Liegenschaften erwerben, belehnen, verwalten und veräussern sowie Patente und Lizenzen erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ORGANISATIONS UND TREUHAND AG | Klingnau | 12.07.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Stäuble Treuhand AG | Laufenburg | <2004 | 14.01.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Lang Investment & Consulting AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SLYNET AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006083262, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SLYNET AG, in Lupfig, CHE-103.560.000, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 215 vom 06.11.2023, Publ. 1005877551). [Der Verzicht auf die eingeschränkte Revision (opting-out) wurde aufgehoben.] [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 15.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ORGANISATIONS UND TREUHAND AG (CHE-105.776.249), in Klingnau, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005877551, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SLYNET AG, in Lupfig, CHE-103.560.000, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 24.06.2020, Publ. 1004919108).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hallauer-Bider, Tanja, von Langenbruck, in Rüfenach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Häseli, Salomon, von Gipf-Oberfrick, in Windisch, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Klotz, Sebastian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Häg-Ehrsberg (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004919108, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
SLYNET AG, in Lupfig, CHE-103.560.000, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 18.05.2017, Publ. 3530403).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kochs, Matthias, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Basel, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.